Whorley et al v. Northam et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Brummett, Felipe Franco, Dwight Horton, Milton Williams, Sr., Antonio Perryel, Brenda Van Emmenis, Courtney Stroble, Benjamen Fyfe, Candace Blakenship, Bruce Harris, Jr., Johnathan McMillian, Warren Brooks, Ennis Stewart, Warren Medley-Green, Jesse Davenport, Larog Trowell, Anthony Vicks, Gale Jones, Da'Von Walker, Donnie Offenbacker, Matthew Mosher, Frank Fairchild, Olivia Ivashin, Alonzo Williams, Lartaija Banks, Brooke Whorley and Michael Sullivan
Defendant: Tori Raiford, Brian J. Moran, Eric Aldridge, Tracy Ray, Harold Clarke, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Ralph S. Northam, Tikki Hicks, Donald Wilmouth, Joseph Bateman, Rodney Younce, Thomas Meyer, Tammy Williams, Warden Rick White and Phillip White
Case Number: 3:2020cv00255
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Referring Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT by Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce. (O'Shea, Margaret)
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT by Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce. (O'Shea, Margaret)
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from Conrad Burke requesting documents. Copy of the complaint mailed as requested. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (smej, )
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce. (O'Shea, Margaret)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on the Parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss and Retain Jurisdiction (the "Joint Motion"), filed on May 11, 2020 #11 . For good cause shown, and in consideration of the Parties' Joint Motion, the Court hereby GRANTS the Parties' Joint Motion and conditionally dismisses the above-titled action with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). In accordance with the Settlement Agreement, which was filed with this Court as Exhibit A to Parties' Joint Motion (ECF No. #11 -1) and is attached hereto, the Court specifically retains jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the Settlement Agreement in accordance with its terms, pursuant to Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Insurance Co. of America, 511 U.S. 375 (1994). It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 5/12/20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jsau, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Retain Jurisdiction by Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Heilman, Eden)
May 8, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge David J. Novak:Settlement Conference held on 5/8/2020. (cgar)
May 1, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge David J. Novak:Telephone Conference held on 5/1/2020. (cgar)
April 28, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge David J. Novak:Settlement Conference (TELEPHONIC) held on 4/28/2020. (cgar)
April 23, 2020 Settlement Conference (TELEPHONIC) set for 4/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge David J. Novak. (cgar)
April 22, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge David J. Novak:Telephone Conferences held on 4/22/2020. (cgar)
April 20, 2020 Conference Call w/ Plts' Counsel set for 4/22/2020 at 02:00 PM; w/Defs' at 03:00 PM and w/ ALL counsel at 03:30 PM before District Judge David J. Novak. (cgar)
April 20, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation to Judge Novak.
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (Referring Case for Mediation) - It is hereby ORDERED that this case is REFERRED to United States District Judge David J. Novak for mediation. The suspension of deadlines previously set by the Court is CONTINUED until such time as mediation is completed. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/20/2020. (Copy sent to Judge Novak) (smej, )
April 17, 2020 Telephone Conference held on 4/17/2020 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar on behalf of Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr (Agraharkar, Vishal)
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Marie Safstrom on behalf of Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr (Safstrom, Jennifer)
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Gloria Tortoriello on behalf of Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr (Tortoriello, Nicole)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eden Brooke Heilman on behalf of Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr (Heilman, Eden)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER - Accordingly, the Court SUSPENDS the deadlines in this case for fourteen (14) days in order for the parties to have an opportunity to come to a resolution. If counsel later feel that they are making substantial progress, the Court will continue the suspension of the deadlines. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/13/2020. (smej, )
April 13, 2020 Telephone Conference held on 4/13/2020 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce. (O'Shea, Margaret)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Hoehl O'Shea on behalf of Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce (O'Shea, Margaret)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr. (Harding, Elliott)
April 8, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (smej, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-7151697) filed by Brooke Whorley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Harding, Elliott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whorley et al v. Northam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Brummett
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Franco
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Horton
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Williams, Sr.
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Perryel
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Van Emmenis
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Stroble
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamen Fyfe
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Blakenship
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Harris, Jr.
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan McMillian
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Brooks
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ennis Stewart
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Medley-Green
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Davenport
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larog Trowell
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Vicks
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale Jones
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Da'Von Walker
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Offenbacker
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Mosher
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Fairchild
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Ivashin
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo Williams
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lartaija Banks
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Whorley
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sullivan
Represented By: Elliott Michael Harding
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Safstrom
Represented By: Nicole Gloria Tortoriello
Represented By: Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Represented By: Eden Brooke Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tori Raiford
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian J. Moran
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Aldridge
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Ray
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Clarke
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Ratliffe-Walker
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph S. Northam
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tikki Hicks
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Wilmouth
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bateman
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Younce
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Meyer
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Williams
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Rick White
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip White
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?