Valladares-Cruz v. Superintendent et al
Petitioner: Luis Fernando Valladares-Cruz
Respondent: Superintendent and Secretary of Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv00938
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth W Hanes
Referring Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Luis Fernando Valladares-Cruz. (jsmi, )
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER that the petition is CONDITIONALLY FILED pending payment of any assessed filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Petitioner the standardized form for filing a 2241 petition. Petitioner is DIRECTED to complete and return the form to the Court within 11 days of the date of entry hereof. The Clerk shall mail an appropriate in forma pauperis affidavit to Petitioner. Failure of Petitioner to complete and return the in forma pauperis affidavit or pay the $5.00 filing fee within 15 days of the date of entry hereof will result in dismissal of the action. The Clerk shall obtain a certified copy of Petitioners trust fund account for the 6 month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 1/14/2021. Copy to Petitioner as directed. (jsmi, )
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Luis Fernando Valladares-Cruz. (jsmi, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valladares-Cruz v. Superintendent et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis Fernando Valladares-Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?