ZAHIR v. HOGAN et al
Plaintiff: Naja Talibah Zahir
Defendant: Lawrence Joseph Hogan, Jr., Governor of Virginia Ralph Northam, James Mountcastle, Anne Colt Leitess, Thomas A Moorehead, Michael L. Chapman, Dorian Lambert, Helen Keller, Aisha N Braveboy, Derreck Claget and Buta Biberaj
Trustee: Queen Naja
Case Number: 3:2021cv00547
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Richmond Office
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Acceptance of Certificate by Naja Talibah Zahir. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Equitable Interest in Trusts, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(asho, )
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 AMENDED Certificate of Service by Naja Talibah Zahir. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(asho, )
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Final Invoices, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Envelope)(asho, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-06051. Original file and docket sheet received.
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order COPY OF DOC. NOS. 98 AND 99 HAVE BEEN MAILED TO UNREP. PARTIES. (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT MOTIONS (DOCS. 55, 60) ARE GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS (DOCS. 10, 20, 25, 28, 32, 53, 65, 69, 76, 81, 82, 83, 85, 89, 90, 95, 96, 97) ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/23/21. 8/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/23/21. 8/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT, EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION TO SET HEARING, EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED*. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA VIA CM/ECF (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ALEXANDER FRANCUZENKO, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MICHAEL L CHAPMAN, DORIAN LAMBERT. *FILING FEE PAID* (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 40, receipt number PPE230215 (sbt, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE by JAMES MOUNTCASTLE of Substitute Attorney (FETTERMAN, JASON) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Declaration by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Declaration by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR., EXHIBITS *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 OPINION AND MOTION, EXHIBITS *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND AFFIDAVIT OF RACKETEERING IN SUPPORT THEREOF, EXHIBITS filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ADDITIONAL BRIEF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit) (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Change of Address by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 EXHIBITS by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(md, ) (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION, EXHIBITS filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED*. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 EXHIBIT Form 56 by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(md, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2021: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document) (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION FOR SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM, EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED*. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit, #4 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS FILED BY NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(lvj, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2021: #1 Exhibit SEALED DOCUMENT, #2 Exhibit SEALED DOCUMENT) (lvj, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION TO DEPOSIT FUNDS FILED BY NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(lvj, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2021: #1 Exhibit SEALED DOCUMENT, #2 Exhibit SEALED DOCUMENT) (lvj, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.(FILED UNDER SEAL) (md, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2021: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document) (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR (Attachments: #1 EMAIL ATTACHMENT)(JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT, EXHIBITS, NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE OF ENTITY CORRECTION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order DOC. NOS. 50 AND 67 MAILED TO UNREPS ON 3/8/2021.(md, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(md, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2021: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document) (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE by MICHAEL L CHAPMAN, DORIAN LAMBERT of Withdrawal of CRAIG STAUDENMAIER and Appearance of Thea Paolini.(STAUDENMAIER, CRAIG) Modified on 2/25/2021 (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 EXHIBIT by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT, BRIEF IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
February 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS IN RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR., BRIEF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 EMAIL)(rf, ) Modified on 2/8/2021 (rf, ). Modified on 2/8/2021 (rf, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR, EXHIBIT *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, ) Modified on 2/8/2021 (rf, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, EXHIBIT *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ANNE COLT LEITESS, ANNE COLT LEITESS.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SHIFF, WENDY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISISON OF WENDY L. SHIFF IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/4/21. 2/4/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, EXHIBIT by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for Default Judgment against, EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT JAMES MOUNTCASTLE, EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 EMAIL 1, #4 EMAIL 2)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMENDED DOCUMENT by AISHA N BRAVEBOY, AISHA N BRAVEBOY, LAWRENCE JOSEPH HOGAN, JR, ANNE COLT LEITESS, ANNE COLT LEITESS. Amendment to #62 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Wendy L. Shiff (MD OAG) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14875424.) Certificate of Service, correcting method of service only. (SMITH, RYAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Wendy L. Shiff (MD OAG) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14875424.) filed by AISHA N BRAVEBOY, AISHA N BRAVEBOY, LAWRENCE JOSEPH HOGAN, JR, ANNE COLT LEITESS, ANNE COLT LEITESS.Certificate of Service.(SMITH, RYAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE re: SCANNED RECEIPTS by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JAMES MOUNTCASTLE.Failure to State Claim. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum - Motion to Dismiss - James Mountcastle, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of James Mountcastle - EFILED - 1-27-2021, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Motion to Dismiss - James Mountcastle - EFILED 1-27-2021)(CREECH, JAY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY H. CREECH on behalf of JAMES MOUNTCASTLE (CREECH, JAY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT/REQUEST FOR DEFAULT, EXHIBITS by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RESPONSE TO THE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR DISMISSAL, AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or Alternatively to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Virginia filed by MICHAEL L CHAPMAN, DORIAN LAMBERT.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support)(STAUDENMAIER, CRAIG) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG J. STAUDENMAIER on behalf of MICHAEL L CHAPMAN, DORIAN LAMBERT with Certificate of Service(STAUDENMAIER, CRAIG) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ROYAL PREROGATIVE WRIT OF MANDAMUS, EXHIBITS by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ROYAL PREROGATIVE WRIT OF MANDAMUS, EXHIBITS by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rf, ) Modified on 1/25/2021 (rf, ). *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JAY H. CREECH IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/25/21. 1/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE RECEIVED 2 CHECKS NUMBERED 1033 AND 1034 FROM QUEEN NAJA AS REFERENCED IN THE ROYAL PREROGATIVE WRIT OF MANDAMUS FILED ON 1/25/21 (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE RECEIVED 7 CHECKS NUMBERED 1010, 10111, 1012, 1013, 1014, 1030 AND 1031 FROM QUEEN NAJA AS REFERENCED IN THE ROYAL PREROGATIVE WRIT OF MANDAMUS FILED ON 1/25/21 (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PERROGATIVE WRIT FOR INJUNCTION, EXHIBITS by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Declaration by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR., EXHIBIT, NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Declaration, filed by PRO SE PLFF NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED" (Attachments: #1 Email for scanned declaration)(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Declaration by QUEEN NAJA. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL ATTACHMENT)(JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jay H. Creech, Esquire by JAMES MOUNTCASTLE.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(WOTHERS, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jay H. Creech, Esquire by JAMES MOUNTCASTLE.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(WOTHERS, JEFFREY) (INCORRECT PDF; ATTY HAS REFILED AT PAPER #45) Modified on 1/21/2021 (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by JAMES MOUNTCASTLE. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14858578). (WOTHERS, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DECLARATION by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, EXHIBITS by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 EXHIBITS by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, TEXT OF PROPOSED ORDER by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 EMAIL) *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED*(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PROPOSED ORDER, EMAIL by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR (Attachments: #1 EMAIL) *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED*(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE re: ROYAL PREROGATORY WRIT FOR BOUNTY, EXHIBITS by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, by QUEEN NAJA. (Attachments: #1 WRIT, #2 WRIT, #3 PROPOSED ORDER, #4 EMAIL)(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 *EX PARTE* EXHIBIT by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Letter dated 1/6/21 by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR (amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Proof of Service by Natalia Domnique, re: served summons and complaint upon DEFTS DORIAN LAMBERT, HELEN KELLER, & MICHAEL L. CHAPMAN by certified mail, return receipts requested. (Attachments: #1 Scanned certified receipts, #2 E-Mail attachment)(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 *EX PARTE* EXHIBITS by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 EXHIBITS by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 EXHIBITS by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED PRIVATE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STIMULUS FUNDING FILED BY QUEEN NAJA. (Attachments: #1 Email)(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Order filed by QUEEN NAJA.. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, #2 PROPOSED ORDER, #3 EMAIL)(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PRIVATE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STIMULUS FUNDING, EXHIBITS *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR..(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 2, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERKS OFFICE RECEIVED 1 CHECK NUMBERED 1005 FROM QUEEN NAJA AS REFERENCED IN THE PRIVATE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STIMULUS FUNDING FILED ON 1/2/21 (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Royal Opinion, Motion and Decree filed by Queen Naja. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Email)(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
January 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Royal Opinion, Motion and Decree. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Attachment)(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCANNED CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS, EXHIBIT by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 EXHIBIT by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED*(rf, ) (Main Document 24 replaced on 1/29/2021) (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service by NATALIA DOMINIQUE re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon BUTA BIBERAJ via Certified Mail on 12/28/20 *NO ORIGINAL CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ATTACHED*; served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon DERRECK CLAGET via Certified mail on 12/28/20 *NO ORIGINAL CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ATTACHED*; served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon Anne Colt Leitess via Certified Mail on 12/22/20 *NO ORIGINAL CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ATTACHED*; served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon Lawrence Joseph Hogan, Jr. via Certified Mail on 12/21/20 *NO ORIGINAL CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ATTACHED*; served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon James Mountcastle via Certified Mail on 12/23/20 *NO ORIGINAL CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ATTACHED*; served Summons and Complaint upon Ralph Northam via Certified Mail on 12/22/20 *NO ORIGINAL CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ATTACHED*; served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon Thomas A. Moorehead via Certified Mail on 12/28/20 *NO ORIGINAL CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ATTACHED*; served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon Aisha N. Braveboy via Certified Mail on 12/28/20 *NO ORIGINAL CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ATTACHED* *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 BILL OF PARTICULARS FOR SETTLEMENT, EXHIBIT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR.. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 EMAIL, #2 Certificate of Service)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ROYAL DECREE, HEIRSHIP AFFIDAVIT, APOSTILLE PARAMOUNT TITLE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 BILL OF PARTICULARS FOR SETTLEMENT, EXHIBIT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Supersedeas Bond filed by QUEEN NAJA. (NO ENVELOPE INCLUDED) (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Proposed Order by QUEEN NAJA. (Attachments: #1 Email)(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED BILL IN EQUITY by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR (Attachments: #1 ATTACHMENT)(JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against BUTA BIBERAJ, AISHA N BRAVEBOY, MICHAEL L CHAPMAN, DERRECK CLAGET, LAWRENCE JOSEPH HOGAN, JR, HELEN KELLER, DORIAN LAMBERT, ANNE COLT LEITESS, THOMAS A MOOREHEAD, JAMES MOUNTCASTLE, RALPH NORTHAM, filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR., BRIEF IN SUPPORT, EXHIBIT, NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to BUTA BIBERAJ, AISHA N BRAVEBOY, MICHAEL L CHAPMAN, DERRECK CLAGET, LAWRENCE JOSEPH HOGAN, JR, HELEN KELLER, DORIAN LAMBERT, ANNE COLT LEITESS, THOMAS A MOOREHEAD, JAMES MOUNTCASTLE, RALPH NORTHAM AND EMAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF ON 12/16/20. (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against LAWRENCE JOSEPH HOGAN, JR, RALPH NORTHAM, filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR., BRIEF IN SUPPORT, EXHIBITS. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS, #2 SUMMONS, #3 SUMMONS, #4 SUMMONS, #5 SUMMONS, #6 SUMMONS, #7 SUMMONS, #8 SUMMONS, #9 SUMMONS, #10 EMAIL)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number PPE222104 (dmc, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION FOR ORDER filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED*.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT IF ZAHIR SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE SHE MUST WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER EITHER PAY $402 TO THE CLERK OR COURT OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. CLERK OF COURT SHAL PROVIDE ZAHIR WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF CASE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. FURTHER ORDERED THAT ZAHIRS MOTION FOR INJUNCTION RELIEF IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/15/20. 12/15/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NON PRISONER IFP PACKET EMAILED TO ZAHIR*(rf, ) Modified on 12/15/2020 (rf, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Supersedeas Bond, Memo by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 MEMO)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSINED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/7/20. 12/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR, EXHIBITS *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR THAT THE BILL OF EQUITY AND CERTIFIED FINANCIAL STATEMENT AND BILL AND THIS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE HAS BEEN MAILED US MAIL TO: MARK HERRIG; RALPH NORTHAM; BRIAN FROSH AND LAWRENCE HOGAN; ETC. (Attachments: #1 ATTACHMENT)(JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 BILL OF EQUITY by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR (Attachments: #1 ATTACHMENT, #2 ATTACHMENT, #3 ATTACHMENT)(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR..(bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LAWRENCE JOSEPH HOGAN, JR., RALPH NORTHAM, filed by NAJA TALIBAH ZAHIR. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, ) Modified on 12/2/2020 (md, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2020: #2 Memo Style) (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/25/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZAHIR v. HOGAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naja Talibah Zahir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Joseph Hogan, Jr.
Represented By: Wendy L. Shiff
Represented By: Ryan Blake Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor of Virginia Ralph Northam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mountcastle
Represented By: Jay H. Creech
Represented By: Jason E. Fetterman
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Wothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Colt Leitess
Represented By: Wendy L. Shiff
Represented By: Ryan Blake Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A Moorehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Chapman
Represented By: Thea A. Paolini
Represented By: Craig J. Staudenmaier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorian Lambert
Represented By: Thea A. Paolini
Represented By: Craig J. Staudenmaier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aisha N Braveboy
Represented By: Wendy L. Shiff
Represented By: Ryan Blake Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derreck Claget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buta Biberaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Queen Naja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?