Johnson et al v. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Thaddius A. Johnson and Andrea E. Johnson
Defendant: SB DECKING CO., INC., VIKING PUMP, INC., J. HENRY HOLLAND CORPORATION, GARDNER DENVER, INC., FLOWSERVE US, INC. Individually and as successor in interest to EDWARDS VALVES and ROCKWELL EDWARD VALVES, GRINNELL LLC, GOULDS PUMPS LLC, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC, individually and as successor by mergers to KUNKLE INDUSTRIES, INC., AURORA PUMP COMPANY, WACO, INC., NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, a subsidiary of The Dow Chemical Company, BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC., CRANE CO., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., As successor in interest to DELAVAL PUMPS,, THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, WARREN PUMPS LLC and JOHN CRANE, INC.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00132
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 85 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended) by JOHN CRANE, INC..(Schneider, Brian)
December 13, 2018 Filing 84 Waco, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint - First Amended by WACO, INC..(Voyles, Shawn)
December 10, 2018 Notice of Correction re 80 Answer to Complaint, 81 Answer to Complaint. Documents 80 and 81 are filed in the incorrect case. Documents have been removed and counsel directed to file in correct case. (jrin)
December 10, 2018 Notice of Correction re 80 & 81 Answer to Complaint contains an incorrect case number. Counsel directed to contact the Clerk's Office to discuss corrective action. (afar)
December 10, 2018 Filing 83 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by CRANE CO..(Wiemken, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Filing 82 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Grinnell, LLC by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY.(Oakley, David)
December 7, 2018 Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., As successor in interest to DELAVAL PUMPS,.(Brunick, Timothy)
December 7, 2018 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(Brunick, Timothy)
December 7, 2018 Filing 79 Aurora Pump Company's ANSWER to Crossclaim by Grinnell, LLC by AURORA PUMP COMPANY.(Barnes, Brianna)
December 7, 2018 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by AURORA PUMP COMPANY.(Barnes, Brianna)
December 6, 2018 Filing 77 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Grinnell LLC by SB DECKING CO., INC..(Poretz, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2018 Filing 76 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Grinnell LLC by GARDNER DENVER, INC..(Poretz, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2018 Filing 75 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Grinnell LLC by BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC..(Poretz, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2018 Filing 74 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Grinnell LLC by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC..(Poretz, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2018 Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended) by BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC..(Poretz, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Poretz on behalf of BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Poretz, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2018 Filing 71 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Poretz, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2018 Filing 70 Memorandum in Support re #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Regarding Grinnell's Cross-claims filed by JOHN CRANE, INC.. (Schneider, Brian)
December 6, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Regarding Grinnell's Cross-claims by JOHN CRANE, INC.. (Schneider, Brian)
December 6, 2018 Filing 68 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(Brunick, Timothy)
December 6, 2018 Filing 67 J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC ANSWER to Complaint FIRST AMENDED by J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC, individually and as successor by mergers to KUNKLE INDUSTRIES, INC..(Coules, Joseph)
December 6, 2018 Filing 66 J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC ANSWER to Crossclaim OF GRINNELL LLC by J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC, individually and as successor by mergers to KUNKLE INDUSTRIES, INC..(Coules, Joseph)
December 5, 2018 Filing 65 Crane Co. ANSWER to Crossclaim of Grinnell LLC by CRANE CO..(Wiemken, Christopher)
December 5, 2018 Filing 64 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., As successor in interest to DELAVAL PUMPS,.(Brunick, Timothy)
December 5, 2018 Filing 63 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Grinnell by WACO, INC..(Voyles, Shawn)
December 4, 2018 Filing 62 ANSWER to Crossclaim of GRINNELL LLC by J. HENRY HOLLAND CORPORATION.(O'Donnell, Robert)
December 4, 2018 Filing 61 Defendant Union Carbide Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, a subsidiary of The Dow Chemical Company.(Nexsen, William)
December 3, 2018 Filing 60 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Grinnell by VIKING PUMP, INC..(Brisker, Malcolm)
December 3, 2018 Filing 59 ANSWER to Crossclaim of GRINNELL by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., As successor in interest to DELAVAL PUMPS,.(Brunick, Timothy)
December 3, 2018 Filing 58 ANSWER to Crossclaim of GRINNELL by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(Brunick, Timothy)
December 3, 2018 Filing 57 Defendant Union Carbide Corporation's ANSWER to Crossclaim and Grounds of Defense by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, a subsidiary of The Dow Chemical Company.(Nexsen, William)
December 3, 2018 Filing 56 ANSWER to #49 Amended Complaint by J. HENRY HOLLAND CORPORATION. (O'Donnell, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 55 Corrected ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by SB DECKING CO., INC..(Poretz, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2018 Notice of Correction re #54 Answer to Complaint (Amended) by SB DECKING CO., INC.. Document number #54 has a case number, caption, and/or style that does not correspond to the case in which you filed. Please refile this document with the correct case number, caption, and/or style. (tbro)
November 29, 2018 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by SB DECKING CO., INC..(Poretz, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2018 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by GARDNER DENVER, INC..(Poretz, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2018 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC..(Poretz, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #40 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James G. Kennedy as certified by local counsel William W. Nexsen by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, a subsidiary of The Dow Chemical Company. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 11/19/2018. (Allen, Arenda)
November 19, 2018 Filing 50 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by VIKING PUMP, INC..(Brisker, Malcolm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 49 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thaddius A. Johnson, Andrea E. Johnson.(tbro)
November 16, 2018 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GRINNELL LLC. (Maier, Jonathan)
November 16, 2018 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GRINNELL LLC.(Maier, Jonathan)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER finding as moot #23 the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; and finding as moot #23 the Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The parties have consented to the filing of an Amended Complaint, rendering this motion moot. Counsel are free to evaluate whether the motion should be renewed against the Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on November 16, 2018. (Allen, Arenda)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 , the unopposed Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit 1 to their motion and memorandum shall be deemed filed as of November 16, 2018; Defendants have until December 20, 2018 to file responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. By separate Order the pending motion to dismiss directed at the Complaint that is no longer of record will be dismissed as moot. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 11/16/2018. (Allen, Arenda)
November 13, 2018 Filing 44 Opposition to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Andrea E. Johnson, Thaddius A. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Jewell, Erin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 43 Memorandum in Support re #42 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Andrea E. Johnson, Thaddius A. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jewell, Erin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Complaint by Andrea E. Johnson, Thaddius A. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jewell, Erin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2018: #2 Proposed Order) (bpet, ).
November 13, 2018 Filing 41 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Andrea E. Johnson, Thaddius A. Johnson. (Jewell, Erin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 40 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James G. Kennedy and Certification of Local Counsel William W. Nexsen by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, a subsidiary of The Dow Chemical Company. (Nexsen, William)
November 8, 2018 Filing 39 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by GOULDS PUMPS LLC. (Maier, Jonathan)
November 8, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Maier on behalf of GOULDS PUMPS LLC (Maier, Jonathan)
November 8, 2018 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC..(Poretz, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Poretz on behalf of AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. (Poretz, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2018 Filing 35 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.. (Poretz, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2018 Filing 34 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC, individually and as successor by mergers to KUNKLE INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Coules, Joseph)
November 7, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint by J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC, individually and as successor by mergers to KUNKLE INDUSTRIES, INC..(Coules, Joseph)
November 6, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Lynn Barnes on behalf of AURORA PUMP COMPANY (Barnes, Brianna)
November 1, 2018 Filing 31 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by GARDNER DENVER, INC.. (Schwertz, Carl)
November 1, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Robert Schwertz on behalf of GARDNER DENVER, INC. (Schwertz, Carl)
October 31, 2018 Filing 29 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by J. HENRY HOLLAND CORPORATION. (O'Donnell, Robert)
October 31, 2018 Filing 28 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by AURORA PUMP COMPANY. (Bowen, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by AURORA PUMP COMPANY.(Bowen, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 26 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Oakley, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by David Brandt Oakley on behalf of THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY (Oakley, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Oakley, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Oakley, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Reeves, Eric)
October 30, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY.(Reeves, Eric)
October 30, 2018 Filing 20 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by VIKING PUMP, INC.. (Brisker, Malcolm)
October 30, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by VIKING PUMP, INC..(Brisker, Malcolm)
October 30, 2018 Filing 18 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CRANE CO.. (Wiemken, Christopher)
October 30, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by CRANE CO..(Wiemken, Christopher)
October 29, 2018 Filing 16 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by WACO, INC.. (Voyles, Shawn)
October 29, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by WACO, INC..(Voyles, Shawn)
October 29, 2018 Notice of Correction re #14 Financial Disclosure Statement, #13 Answer to Complaint. The filing users login does not match the signature on the document. The filing user must refile the document with the filing users signature block, or the attorney whose signature block appears on the document must refile the document. (tbro)
October 29, 2018 Notice of Correction re #13 Waco, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint. Document number #13 does not include a Certificate of Service. Please file the Certificate of Service as a separate document. Use the Certificate of Service event (under Notices) and link the Certificate of Service to document number #13 . (tbro)
October 26, 2018 Filing 14 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by WACO, INC.. (Voyles, Shawn)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 Waco, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by WACO, INC..(Voyles, Shawn)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Poretz on behalf of SB DECKING CO., INC. (Poretz, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by SB DECKING CO., INC.. (Poretz, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2018 Notice of Correction re #10 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James G. Kennedy and Certification of Local Counsel J. Derek Turrietta Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6332143. The signature block on the motion does not match the filing user's login. Certification of local counsel should reflect the counsel of record listed on the motion. The filing user should refile the motion with the corrected signature block. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James G. Kennedy and Certification of Local Counsel J. Derek Turrietta Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6332143. by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, a subsidiary of The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Application for Foreign Attorney)(Turrietta, James)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, a subsidiary of The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Admission Pro Hav Vice, #2 Application to Qualify as a Foreign Attorney)(Turrietta, James)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., As successor in interest to DELAVAL PUMPS,. (Brunick, Timothy)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by WARREN PUMPS LLC. (Brunick, Timothy)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 Letter to defendant Union Carbide's attorney re: associating with local counsel. (epri, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 COPIES OF ANSWERS to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLOWSERVE US, INC. Individually and as successor in interest to EDWARDS VALVES and ROCKWELL EDWARD VALVES, GARDNER DENVER, INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., As successor in interest to DELAVAL PUMPS,, J. HENRY HOLLAND CORPORATION, SB DECKING CO., INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, a subsidiary of The Dow Chemical Company, WARREN PUMPS LLC, GOULDS PUMPS LLC (epri, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by JOHN CRANE, INC. (epri, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by JOHN CRANE, INC. (epri, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the City of Newport News, case number CL 1803189B-04 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6325788.), filed by JOHN CRANE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB DECKING CO., INC.
Represented By: Carl Robert Schwertz
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Poretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIKING PUMP, INC.
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. HENRY HOLLAND CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert L. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Poretz
Represented By: Carl Robert Schwertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC. Individually and as successor in interest to EDWARDS VALVES and ROCKWELL EDWARD VALVES
Represented By: William Delaney Bayliss
Represented By: Lynn Kanaga Brugh, IV
Represented By: Meredith Macdonald Haynes
Represented By: Joseph Earl Blackburn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLC
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Popecki
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS LLC
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Popecki
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: Carl Robert Schwertz
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Poretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY LLC, individually and as successor by mergers to KUNKLE INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Coules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: David Charles Bowen
Represented By: Brianna Lynn Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WACO, INC.
Represented By: Shawn Ashley Voyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY
Represented By: Eric George Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, a subsidiary of The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: William W. Nexsen
Represented By: James Derek Turrietta
Represented By: James Guy Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Carl Robert Schwertz
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Poretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: Christopher John Wiemken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., As successor in interest to DELAVAL PUMPS,
Represented By: Timothy S. Brunick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY
Represented By: Albert Harrison Poole
Represented By: David Brandt Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Represented By: Marilyn Nicole Harvey
Represented By: Timothy S. Brunick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Represented By: Brian James Schneider
Represented By: Lisa Moran McMurdo
Represented By: Mary Louise Roberts
Represented By: Eric George Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddius A. Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer West Stevens
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Jewell
Represented By: Jeannette Marie Dodson-O'Connell
Represented By: Hugh Bernard McCormick, III
Represented By: Robert Randolph Hatten
Represented By: Spencer Alan Reiss
Represented By: William Wesley Coleman Harty
Represented By: Donald Neal Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea E. Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer West Stevens
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Jewell
Represented By: Jeannette Marie Dodson-O'Connell
Represented By: Hugh Bernard McCormick, III
Represented By: Robert Randolph Hatten
Represented By: Spencer Alan Reiss
Represented By: William Wesley Coleman Harty
Represented By: Donald Neal Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?