Hulkenberg et al v. Anabaptist Healthshare et al
Plaintiff: Larry Bowen, Jeremy Hulkenberg, Andrew Hall, William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr., Ronald Jones and William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr.
Defendant: Kingdom Healthshare Ministries LLC, Kingdom Healthshare International, Unity Healthshare LLC, Anabaptist Healthshare, Oneshare Health, LLC, Alex Cardona and Tyler W. Hochstetler
Case Number: 3:2019cv00031
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Joint Briefing Order. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 07/15/2019. (ssm)
July 15, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2019 02:00 PM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. (ssm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 40 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jcj)
July 8, 2019 Filing 39 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anabaptist Healthshare (Peritz, Marc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 38 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tyler W. Hochstetler (Peritz, Marc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 37 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alex Cardona (Peritz, Marc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 36 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oneshare Health, LLC identifying Corporate Parent OneShare International for Oneshare Health, LLC. (Peritz, Marc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 35 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Anabaptist Healthshare, Alex Cardona, Tyler W. Hochstetler, Kingdom Healthshare Ministries LLC, Oneshare Health, LLC, Unity Healthshare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Peritz, Marc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Anabaptist Healthshare, Alex Cardona, Tyler W. Hochstetler, Kingdom Healthshare Ministries LLC, Oneshare Health, LLC, Unity Healthshare LLC. (Peritz, Marc)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for defendants to respond to plaintiffs' complaint. Defendants' deadline for filing responsive pleadings is extended to July 8, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 6/25/19. (jcj)
June 24, 2019 Filing 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Complaint for Wrongful Termination in Violation of Public Policy by Anabaptist Healthshare, Alex Cardona, Tyler W. Hochstetler, Kingdom Healthshare Ministries LLC, Oneshare Health, LLC, Unity Healthshare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horvath, Rachel)
June 12, 2019 Filing 31 RETURN of service of Complaint on 06/03/2019 upon OneShare Health, RA(Connick, Thomas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 30 RETURN of service of Complaint on 06/03/2019 upon Unity Healthshare, RA(Connick, Thomas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 29 RETURN of service of Complaint on 06/03/2019 upon Kingdom Healthshare, RA(Connick, Thomas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 28 RETURN of service of Complaint on 06/03/2019 upon Kingdom Healthshare(Connick, Thomas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 27 RETURN of service of Complaint on 06/03/2019 upon Tyler W. Hochstetler, Esq.(Connick, Thomas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 26 RETURN of service of Anabaptist Healthshare on 06/03/2019 upon Anabaptist Healthshare(Connick, Thomas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 25 RETURN of service of Complaint on 06/03/2019 upon Anabaptist Healthshare(Connick, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 24 Electronic Summons Issued as to Unity Healthshare LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)
May 24, 2019 Filing 23 Electronic Summons Issued as to Unity Healthshare LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 Electronic Summons Issued as to Oneshare Health, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 Electronic Summons Issued as to Oneshare Health, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kingdom Healthshare Ministries LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kingdom Healthshare Ministries LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tyler W. Hochstetler NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alex Cardona NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 Electronic Summons Issued as to Anabaptist Healthshare NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 Electronic Summons Issued as to Anabaptist Healthshare NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Summons by Andrew Hall, Ronald Jones, William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr, Jeremy Hulkenberg, William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr, Larry Bowen as to Tyler W. Hochstetler.(Connick, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons by Andrew Hall, Ronald Jones, William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr, Jeremy Hulkenberg, William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr, Larry Bowen as to Alex Cardona.(Connick, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Summons by Andrew Hall, Ronald Jones, William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr, Jeremy Hulkenberg, William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr, Larry Bowen as to Unity Healthshare LLC.(Connick, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons by Andrew Hall, Ronald Jones, William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr, Jeremy Hulkenberg, William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr, Larry Bowen as to Unity Healthshare LLC.(Connick, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons by Andrew Hall, Ronald Jones, William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr, Jeremy Hulkenberg, William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr, Larry Bowen as to Oneshare Health, LLC.(Connick, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons by Andrew Hall, Ronald Jones, William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr, Jeremy Hulkenberg, William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr, Larry Bowen as to Oneshare Health, LLC.(Connick, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons by Andrew Hall, Ronald Jones, William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr, Jeremy Hulkenberg, William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr, Larry Bowen as to Oneshare Health, LLC.(Connick, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons by Andrew Hall, Ronald Jones, William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr, Jeremy Hulkenberg, William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr, Larry Bowen as to Kingdom Healthshare Ministries LLC.(Connick, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons by Andrew Hall, Ronald Jones, William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr, Jeremy Hulkenberg, William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr, Larry Bowen as to Kingdom Healthshare Ministries LLC.(Connick, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons by Andrew Hall, Ronald Jones, William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr, Jeremy Hulkenberg, William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr, Larry Bowen as to Anabaptist Healthshare.(Connick, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Andrew Hall, Ronald Jones, William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr, Jeremy Hulkenberg, William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr, Larry Bowen as to Anabaptist Healthshare.(Connick, Thomas)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas J. Connick for Larry Bowen, Andrew Hall, Jeremy Hulkenberg, William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr,William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr. and Ronald Jones added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 5/21/19. (jcj)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Thomas J. Connick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3146451. by William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Armstrong, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt 0423-3145881.), filed by Andrew Hall, Ronald Jones, William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr, Jeremy Hulkenberg, William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr, Larry Bowen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hulkenberg et al v. Anabaptist Healthshare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom Healthshare Ministries LLC
Represented By: Rachel Danielle G. Horvath
Represented By: Marc A. Peritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom Healthshare International
Represented By: Rachel Danielle G. Horvath
Represented By: Marc A. Peritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unity Healthshare LLC
Represented By: Rachel Danielle G. Horvath
Represented By: Marc A. Peritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anabaptist Healthshare
Represented By: Rachel Danielle G. Horvath
Represented By: Marc A. Peritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneshare Health, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Danielle G. Horvath
Represented By: Marc A. Peritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Cardona
Represented By: Rachel Danielle G. Horvath
Represented By: Marc A. Peritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler W. Hochstetler
Represented By: Rachel Danielle G. Horvath
Represented By: Marc A. Peritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Bowen
Represented By: Richard C. Armstrong
Represented By: Thomas J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hulkenberg
Represented By: Richard C. Armstrong
Represented By: Thomas J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hall
Represented By: Richard C. Armstrong
Represented By: Thomas J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Richard Hulkenberg, Sr.
Represented By: Richard C. Armstrong
Represented By: Thomas J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Jones
Represented By: Richard C. Armstrong
Represented By: Thomas J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Richard Hulkenberg, Jr.
Represented By: Richard C. Armstrong
Represented By: Thomas J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?