Patrick County, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Patrick County, Virginia
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Beverly Sackler, Mark Timney, CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Kathe Sackler, Allergan Finance, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Insource, Inc., WalMart Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Allergan PLC, Impax Laboratories, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Richard Sackler, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Rhodes Technologies, Caremark, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Cardinal Health, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Actavis, LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Craig Landau, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Optum, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Endo Health Solutions, Inc, KVK-Tech, Inc., Does 1-100, CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Barr Laboratories, Inc., John Stewart, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Russell Gasdia, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Walgreen Co., Specgx LLC, Cephalon, Inc., David Sackler, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Abbvie Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00032
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 30 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 A - Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy)(Massie, Wade)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Stay Case. This case is STAYED temporarily pending a decision by the JPML as to whether the case will be transferred to the Opiate MDL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/20/2019. (ck)
August 20, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Support re #19 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Patrick County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 27 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #19 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (List of Second Wave Cases, 08-16-19), #2 Exhibit 2 (Judge Dillon Orders, 08-16-19), #3 Exhibit 3 (Second Wave Final Transfer Order, 07-31-19), #4 Exhibit 4 (DOJ Statement of Interest, 03-01-18))(Coburn, Samuel)
August 19, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Stay (Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending this Action's Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation) . filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Stay Orders, First & Second Wave Cases), #2 Exhibit B (Judge Greer Stay Order, 04-24-19), #3 Exhibit C (Judge Sargus Orders, S.D. Ohio))(Coburn, Samuel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Stay (Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending this Action's Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation) . filed by Patrick County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Transcript of Proceedings on 12/13/17, #2 Transcript of Hearing on 11/6/17)(Spivey, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 24 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Stay (Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending this Action's Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation) . filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit A)(Coburn, Samuel)
August 13, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay (Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending this Action's Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation) by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Samuel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Support re #4 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Patrick County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
August 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Patrick County, Virginia re #4 of Errata and Correction to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Spivey, William)
August 8, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lollar, Tirzah)
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Patrick County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Tallent Rogers terminated. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 08/01/2019. (aab)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. (Supplemental Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Judge Dillon Order, 02-14-19), #2 Exhibit 2 (Judge Hilton Order, 01-30-19), #3 Exhibit 3 (Final Transfer Order, 04-03-19), #4 Exhibit 4 (List of Second Wave Cases), #5 Exhibit 5 (Second Wave Stay Orders), #6 Exhibit 6 (Final Transfer Order, 07-31-19), #7 Exhibit 7 (Va Sup. Ct. Order, 11-20-18))(Coburn, Samuel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caremark, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Caremark RX, L.L.C. for Caremark, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Caremark RX, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. for CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caremark RX, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Caremark RX, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Coburn, Samuel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Perry Coburn on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. (Coburn, Samuel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by Patrick County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Lauren)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 Paper State Court Records received from Patrick County Circuit Court, CL19-550 (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Continuation of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #3 Continuation of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint & Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #5 Continuation of Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #6 Continuation of Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #7 Continuation of Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal)(ham)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) Modified on 7/26/2019 - corrected docket text (ham).
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRx, Inc. (Broughton, Turner)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. (Broughton, Turner)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner Anderson Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Patrick County, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Patrick County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 7/25/19. (ham)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions, Inc and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc. (ham)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Patrick County Circuit Court, case number CL19-550 (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00; pay.gov receipt number 0423-3190254) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court First Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick County, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Timney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: Paul C. Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Represented By: Paul C. Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx, Inc.
Represented By: Turner Anderson Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Turner Anderson Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Harold David Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Gasdia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Turner Anderson Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Represented By: Paul C. Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick County, Virginia
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Lauren Tallent Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?