United States Of America v. Magnate, LLC
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Magnate, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00127
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION Order in Aid of Access and Memorandum in Support by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Myles Bartos, #4 Exhibit 1 to Myles Bartos Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Myles Bartos Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Myles Bartos Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 to Myles Bartos Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 to Myles Bartos Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 to Myles Bartos Declaration, #10 Exhibit 7 to Myles Bartos Declaration, #11 Exhibit 8 to Myles Bartos Declaration, #12 Exhibit 9 to Myles Bartos Declaration, #13 Exhibit 10 to Myles Bartos Declaration, #14 Exhibit 11 to Myles Bartos Declaration, #15 Exhibit 12 to Myles Bartos Declaration, #16 Exhibit 13 to Myles Bartos Declaration, #17 Exhibit 14 to Myles Bartos Declaration, #18 Exhibit 15 to Myles Bartos Declaration)(Parshalle, Genevieve)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Of America. Magnate, LLC waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018.(Parshalle, Genevieve)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Magnate, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Magnate, LLC, filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Magnate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Genevieve Simone Parshalle
Represented By: Sara Bugbee Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?