United States Of America v. Eight Firearms
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Eight Firearms
Case Number: 5:2019cv00042
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Forfeiture and Publication served on Perry Delawder, Chris Miller, Jennifer Sloat, & Merle Brook Stephens on 06/01/2019, 06/03/2019, 06/11/2019, 07/08/2019, filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proof of Publication, #2 Exhibit B: Proof of Service)(Frith, Krista)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN of service of Warrant In Rem on 6/10/2019 upon Eight Firearms(Frith, Krista)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Eight Firearms, filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Eight Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eight Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Krista Consiglio Frith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?