Amherst County, Virginia v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Plaintiff: Amherst County, Virginia
Defendant: Caremark RX, L.L.C., Beverly Sackler, Mark Timney, Express Scripts Holding Company, Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., Mallinckrodt LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Insource, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Allergan PLC, Mylan Institutional Inc., Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Caremark, L.L.C., Cardinal Health, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Actavis, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Craig Landau, Cephalon, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, CVS Health Corporation, Optum, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Does 1-100, Indivior Inc., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Barr Laboratories, Inc., John Stewart, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Russell Gasdia, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc., Specgx LLC, Walgreen Co., Express Scripts, Inc., David Sackler, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., WalMart Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Kathe Sackler and General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00077
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 49 Case transferred from Virginia Western has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:20-op-45046, filed 02/05/2020. (ck)
February 5, 2020 Filing 48 Notice of MDL Transfer Order from Northern District of Ohio; MDL No. 2804 (ck)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Stay Case. This case is STAYED temporarily pending a decision by the JPML as to whether these cases will be transferred to the Opiate MDL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/30/2020. (ck)
January 29, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Amherst County, Virginia (Conrod, Richard)
January 24, 2020 Filing 45 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #39 MOTION Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) . filed by Amherst County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard)
January 21, 2020 Filing 44 Reply Memorandum in Support of Moving Defendants' Motion for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Federal Officer Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Judge Polster Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Martinsville Stay Order)(Scott, Emily)
January 17, 2020 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum in Support . filed by Amherst County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard)
January 17, 2020 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum in Support (addressing Supplemental Notice of Removal) . filed by Amherst County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard)
January 14, 2020 Filing 41 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants' Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the JPML's Final Transfer Decision . filed by Amherst County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Conrod, Richard)
January 10, 2020 Filing 40 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #39 MOTION Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) . filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
January 10, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
January 10, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court, (and Incorporated Memorandum in Support) filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Federal Officer Removed Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Diversity Removed Cases, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amherst Cahill Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Statement of Work (DOD Contract), #5 Exhibit 5 - List of Opioid Cases, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily) Modified docket text on 1/13/2020 to reflect correct filing event at filer's request. (ca)
January 10, 2020 Filing 37 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #30 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum in Support (addressing Supplemental Notice of Removal) . filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Broughton, Turner)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #31 Motion Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/19/2019. (ck)
December 18, 2019 Filing 35 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eckerd Corporation, Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corp. for Eckerd Corporation, Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.. (Harvey, Patrick)
December 18, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Alan Harvey on behalf of Eckerd Corporation, Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc. (Harvey, Patrick)
December 17, 2019 Filing 33 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #32 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants' Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the JPML's Final Transfer Decision . filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO-122, #2 Exhibit 2 - List of Opioid Cases, #3 Exhibit 3 - Wave 1 and 2 Stay Orders, #4 Exhibit 4 - J. Polster Federal Officer Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Federal Officer Removed Cases, #6 Exhibit 6 - All Federal Officer Stays, #7 Exhibit 7 - Diversity Removed Cases, #8 Exhibit 8 - NY Fraudulent Misjoinder Cases, #9 Exhibit 9 - Federal Question Removed Cases, #10 Exhibit 10 - CAFA Removed Cases, #11 Exhibit 11 - CAFA Stay Orders, #12 Exhibit 12 - Board of Commissioners Opinion, #13 Exhibit 13 - Commonwealth of Kentucky)(Scott, Emily)
December 17, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants' Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the JPML's Final Transfer Decision by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
December 16, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION Setting Briefing Schedule (Unopposed) Regarding Plaintiff's Motions to Remand and Defendants' Forthcoming Motion to Stay by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
December 13, 2019 Filing 30 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum in Support (addressing Supplemental Notice of Removal) by Amherst County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard)
December 13, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Amherst County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Conrod, Richard)
December 5, 2019 Filing 28 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Other Affiliate Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
December 2, 2019 Filing 27 Paper State Court Records received from Amherst County Circuit Court, CL19000828-00, (Paper records available for viewing in the Roanoke Clerk's Office.) (ck)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #21 Motion for an Order Memorializing Parties' Agreement Regarding Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 11/20/2019. (ck)
November 20, 2019 Filing 25 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 24 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 23 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Coburn, Samuel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 22 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Caremark Rx, L.L.C. for CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for an Order Memorializing Parties' Agreement Regarding Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Sarah)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Supplemental Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Broughton, Turner)
November 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Johan Conrod, Jr (Conrod, Richard)
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Cheryl Mandel on behalf of Mylan Institutional Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Mandel, Rebecca)
November 18, 2019 Filing 17 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Institutional Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan, N.V., Corporate Parent Mylan, Inc. for Mylan Institutional Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Talotta, Jon)
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Myer Talotta on behalf of Mylan Institutional Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Talotta, Jon)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Amherst County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 11/18/2019. (ck)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caremark, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Caremark Rx, L.L.C. for Caremark, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. for CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caremark RX, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Caremark RX, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation (Coburn, Samuel)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Perry Coburn on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. (Coburn, Samuel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. (Broughton, Turner)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRx, Inc. (Broughton, Turner)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner Anderson Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company, Corporate Parent Express Scripts, Inc. for Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. (al)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts, Inc. (al)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Express Scripts Holding Company. (al)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company, Corporate Parent Express Scripts, Inc. for ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc. (al)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Amherst County Circuit Court, Case Number CL19-000828-00 (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00, Receipt No. 0423-3269754), filed by Express Scripts, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Caremark RX, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optum, Inc., and OptumRx, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Wave Opioid Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Complaint, Cover Letters, Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Waivers, #4 Civil Cover Sheet - with attachment listing counsel)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amherst County, Virginia v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Timney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Peter John Raupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.
Represented By: Peter John Raupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: Paul C. Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Represented By: Paul C. Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx, Inc.
Represented By: Turner Anderson Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Rebecca Cheryl Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Represented By: Patrick Alan Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic
Represented By: Patrick Alan Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Wells H. Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation
Represented By: Patrick Alan Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Turner Anderson Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Justin Michael Sizemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Alan Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Gasdia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Rebecca Cheryl Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Alan Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Turner Anderson Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Represented By: Paul C. Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amherst County, Virginia
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Lauren Tallent Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?