Braxton v. Red Onion State Prisons Medical Department et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Troy Braxton
Defendant: S. Fletcher, Regional Director, B. Witt, Dr. Fox, Several DOC Employees, Debora Ball, Assistant Warden Fuller, Warden Kiser, V. Culbertson, S. Anderson and Red Onion State Prisons Medical Department
Case Number: 7:2021cv00051
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 4/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/19/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Account Report by Anthony Troy Braxton (aab)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with inmate account form and certified copy of plaintiff's trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint, obtained from the appropriate prison official of each prison at which plaintiff is or was confined during that period within 30 days Responses due by 4/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/18/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) by Anthony Troy Braxton (slt)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/22/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with Trust Account for July and Six-Month Statements within 20 days. Responses due by 3/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/22/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
February 22, 2021 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and statement of Assets by Anthony Troy Braxton (slt)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Anthony Troy Braxton. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (slt)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 2/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/26/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against S. Anderson, Debora Ball, V. Culbertson, S. Fletcher, Fox, Fuller, Kiser, Red Onion State Prisons Medical Department, Regional Director, Several DOC Employees, B. Witt, filed by Anthony Troy Braxton. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braxton v. Red Onion State Prisons Medical Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Witt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Several DOC Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debora Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Warden Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Culbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Onion State Prisons Medical Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Troy Braxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?