Villaflor v. U.S. Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: Ernesto Villaflor
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service, Megan Brennan, Yun Hee Lee, Ron Harrell and Julio Rodriguez
Case Number: 2:2016cv01757
Filed: November 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CORRECTED ORDER granting Defendant's 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment re 41 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff'sremaining claims are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Defendant's 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's remaining claims are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting defendants' 19 Motion to Dismiss; defendants Julio Rodriguez, U.S. Postal Service, Ron Harrell and Yun Hee Lee are dismissed; plaintiff granted leave to amend within 21 days signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Federal defendants' 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Defendant Yun Hee Lee's 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; Answer due 6/9/2017 as to Ron Harrell, Yun Hee Lee, Julio Rodriguez; by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villaflor v. U.S. Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Villaflor
Represented By: Leah R Altaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yun Hee Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?