Hueter v. Haaland et al
Plaintiff: Steven Jay Pincus Hueter and Tao
Defendant: Debra Ann Haaland, Ingrid Anne Pederson, Gerald H Young and S/V Falcon
Case Number: 2:2021cv01271
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Appeal Fees received (21-35855): fee in the amount of $ 505 (receipt # SEA105700) re #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Jay Pincus Hueter (cc: USCA) (RE)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re Referral Notice from Ninth Circuit signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour re #17 Referral Notice. Plaintiff now appeals the dismissal of his case. (Dkt. No. 15.) His notice of appeal does not address the deficiencies in his complaint. (See id.) Therefore, the Court CERTIFIES that Plaintiffs appeal is not taken in good faith and REVOKES his in forma pauperis status. (ad hoc 9th Circuit and cc plaintiff ECF)(RE)
October 18, 2021 Filing 17 REFERRAL NOTICE from the 9th Circuit (21-35855) re #15 Notice of Appeal, This matter is referred to the district court for the limited purpose of determining whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal or whether the appeal is frivolous or taken in bad faith. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3); see also Hooker v. American Airlines, 302 F.3d 1091, 1092 (9th Cir. 2002) (revocation of forma pauperis status is appropriate where district court finds the appeal to be frivolous). If the district court elects to revoke in forma pauperis status, the district court is requested to notify this court and the parties of such determination within 21 days of the date of this referral. If the district court does not revoke in forma pauperis status, such status will continue automatically for this appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). This referral shall not affect the briefing schedule previously established by this court. (CDA)
October 8, 2021 Filing 16 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (21-35855) as to #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Jay Pincus Hueter. (RE)
September 29, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (21-35855) re #11 Order, Add and Terminate Parties, by Plaintiff Steven Jay Pincus Hueter. Appeal fee not paid- In Forma Pauperis granted. (cc: USCA) (Pincus Hueter, Steven) Modified on 10/8/2021 to add CCA#. (RE)
September 28, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's #12 Motion for Reconsideration. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
September 24, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #12 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order,, Add and Terminate Parties, (Pincus Hueter, Steven)
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION with Authorities for Reconsideration re #11 Order,, Add and Terminate Parties, , filed by Plaintiff Steven Jay Pincus Hueter. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 9/24/2021, (Pincus Hueter, Steven) Modified on 9/27/2021 to correct entry title(SR).
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Plaintiff's request to issue summons (Dkt. No. #9 ) is DENIED; his claims against Secretary Haaland are DISMISSED with prejudice, and his claims against Young and Pederson are DISMISSED without prejudice to refiling in a Court with appropriate jurisdiction. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SB)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 APPENDIX re #6 Complaint - ABSTRACT OF TITLE - FROM US COAST GUARD NATIONAL VESSEL DOCUMENTATION CENTER - 09/23/2021 - by Plaintiff Steven Jay Pincus Hueter (Pincus Hueter, Steven)
September 21, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #8 Appendix: Corrected linkage of Appendix [E] and [N] to dkt #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (SR)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST - TO ISSUE SUMMONS - by Plaintiff Steven Jay Pincus Hueter for Issue Summons (Pincus Hueter, Steven)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 APPENDIX [E] and [N] re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis re #6 Complaint - APPENDIX [E] - REDACTED - TO [ECF NO. #6 ] VERIFIED COMPLAINT - by Plaintiff Steven Jay Pincus Hueter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - APPENDIX [N] - - TO [ECF NO. #6 ] VERIFIED COMPLAINT -)(Pincus Hueter, Steven) Modified on 9/22/2021 to link redacted appendix E and added appendix N to dkt #1 (SR).
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE: Plaintiff Steven Jay Pincus Hueter has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Debra Ann Haaland, Ingrid Anne Pederson, S/V Falcon, Gerald H Young (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Steven Jay Pincus Hueter.(SR)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (SR)(cc: Plaintiff via U.S. mail)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (ST)
September 20, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Exhibit E contains personal identifiers that must be redacted per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a) and Local Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and have been sealed. You must refile a redacted version of the document. This will not affect your original filing date. (cc: plaintiff w/docket report via USPS) (ST)
September 20, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The court did not receive Appendix N with the initiating documents. Please submit if you would like the court to consider the document(s). (cc: plaintiff w/docket report via USPS) (ST)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 21-cv-900-RSM, by Plaintiff Steven Jay Pincus Hueter. (ST)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Steven Jay Pincus Hueter. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C, #5 Appendix D, SEALED #6 Appendix E, #7 Appendix F, #8 Appendix G, #9 Appendix H, #10 Appendix I, #11 Appendix J, #12 Appendix K, #13 Appendix L, #14 Appendix M, #15 Appendix O, #16 Summons - Ingrid Pederson, #17 Summons - Gerald Young, #18 Summons - Debra Ann Haaland, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Email from Filer) (Exhibit E sealed as it contains personal identifiers)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hueter v. Haaland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Jay Pincus Hueter
Represented By: Steven Jay Pincus Hueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tao
Represented By: Steven Jay Pincus Hueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Ann Haaland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingrid Anne Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald H Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S/V Falcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?