Cohen v. Hudgins
Petitioner: Jeffrey Cohen
Respondent: Robert Hudgins
Case Number: 1:2020cv00211
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee PAID: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC003013. (wrr)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice of Deficient Pleading, #3 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/27/2020. (wrr)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court (Mailed to PS petitioner via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 IFP and PTAR forms)(Mailed to PS petitioner via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Robert Hudgins, filed by Jeffrey Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Ground One Supporting Facts, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 Envelope)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?