Rodriguez v. Saad
Petitioner: Jose A. Rodriguez
Respondent: Jennifer Saad
Case Number: 2:2018cv00092
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/21/18. (njz)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 9/18/18. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pet via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/7/18 per USPS. (njz)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(copy Petitioner)(cnd)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Extend Page Limit of 28 USC 2241 Petition to Include a Memorandum of Law by Jose A. Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cnd)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNM001374. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope) (cnd)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Jennifer Saad, filed by Jose A. Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope)[Bailey/Mazzone/Blalock](cnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Saad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jennifer Saad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?