Railey v. Warden of Hazelton USP et al

Petitioner: Nathan Railey
Respondent: Warden of Hazelton USP and FBOP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: John Preston Bailey
1 Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/7/19. (cnd)
January 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re ERROR: Case opened in error. Case will be statistically closed. CORRECTION: All documents filed in case 3:18-cv-199. (cmd) Modified on 1/6/2019 Copy mailed to pro se petitioner(cmd). (tlg).
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro SeIn Federal Court (njz) copy mailed to pro se pet via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 Envelope Received re: #1 , #2 , #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 . (njz)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to Proceed with Discovery Process/Request for Discovery by Nathan Railey. (njz)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Nathan Railey. (njz)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental MEMORANDUM to Support by Nathan Railey re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (njz)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Nathan Railey. (Attachments: #1 Ledger)(njz)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nathan Railey. (njz)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against FBOP, Warden of Hazelton USP filed by Nathan Railey. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Notice of Deficient Pleading and Intent to Dismiss) case assigned to Judge Bailey, MJ Mazzone, and LC Blalock(njz) copy of docket sheet mailed to pro se pet via regular mail as requested

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Railey v. Warden of Hazelton USP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Hazelton USP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FBOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathan Railey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?