Thorne v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Tashawn Thorne
Defendant: Officer Ross, The United States Penitentiary Hazelton, United States of America and Officer L. Martin
Case Number: 3:2018cv00124
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Martinsburg Office
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tashawn Thorne. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
October 3, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Tashawn Thorne. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 16 LETTER from deputy clerk to Tashawn Thorne regarding #15 Letter. (Attachments: #1 notice of change of address form).(tlg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 15 LETTER from Tashawn Thorne to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 ** SEALED ** Ledger Sheets by Tashawn Thorne. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 COURT-APPROVED FORM re #1 Complaint, filed by Tashawn Thorne. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
August 31, 2018 Filing 12 Mail sent to Tashawn Thorne #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Returned as Undeliverable (refused/unable to forward). (tlg)
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 Initial partial filing fee: $ 14.00, receipt number WVNE012935 (tlg)
August 22, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/20/2018. (tlg)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 8/15/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff; copy of order and consent to trustee clerk and financial deputy.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
August 13, 2018 Filing 8 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Tashawn Thorne. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Notice (Other), #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/10/2018. (tlg)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDEARL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved FTCA Forms). Original notice and forms mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from Tashawn Thorne to Clerk regarding his PTAR in reference to #1 Complaint filed by Tashawn Thorne. (cwm)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Tashawn Thorne. (cwm)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tashawn Thorne. (cwm)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L. Martin, Ross, The United States Penitentiary Hazelton, United States of America, filed by Tashawn Thorne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Letter & Reports, and #3 Envelope). Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorne v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Penitentiary Hazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tashawn Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?