Banks-Davis v. Adams et al
Petitioner: Lennora R. Banks-Davis
Respondent: P. Adams, William P. Barr, B. Antonelli, R. Keyes and R. McCaffrey
Case Number: 3:2020cv00149
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER from deputy clerk to Lennora R. Banks-Davis regarding #17 Letter. (tlg)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER from Lennora Banks-Davis to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN RECEIPT as to #15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/24/2020. (tlg)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/22/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 Filing fee: $5.00 - receipt number WVNM001726. (cwm)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Second Extension of Time to pay filing fee by Lennora R. Banks-Davis. (Attachments: #1 inmate requests, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to pay the filing fee, by Lennora R. Banks-Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/21/2020. (tlg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/24/2020. (tlg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/24/2020. (tlg)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 8/19/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE $5.00 FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 8/19/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Lennora R. Banks-Davis. (Attachments: #1 index of excess pages; #2 Exhibit 1, Eastern District of Virginia indictment; #3 Exhibit 2, Statement of the case; #4 Exhibit 3, Reference ground one, forensic skill set description, #5 Exhibit 4, Article; #6 Exhibit 5, Reference ground two; #7 Exhibit 6, NCO letter; #8 Exhibit 7, Letter; #9 Exhibit 8, Photocopy of check; #10 List of additional defendants; #11 Envelope).(tlg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lennora R. Banks-Davis re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lennora R. Banks-Davis. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lennora R. Banks-Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against P. Adams, William P. Barr, filed by Lennora R. Banks-Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks-Davis v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lennora R. Banks-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: P. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Keyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?