Rhodes v. Saad

Petitioner: Tavarras Rhodes
Respondent: Jennifer Saad
Case Number: 5:2019cv00004
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: James P Mazzone
1 Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNW002103 (lmm)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 Order #9 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/30/19. (lmm)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #3 IN FORMA PAUPERIS BUT REQUIRING THE PETITIONER TO PAY THE $5 FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 1/29/19. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S 2 MOTION FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 1/29/19. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice of General Guidelines #6 Notice of Deficient Pleading. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/14/19. (lmm)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/11/2019 to correct date) (lmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/ECF) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Tavarras Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tavarras Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL (contained within #1 Memorandum) by Tavarras Rhodes. (lmm)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Jennifer Saad, filed by Tavarras Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes v. Saad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jennifer Saad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tavarras Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?