City of Beckley, West Virginia v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: City of Beckley, West Virginia
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Allergan Sales, LLC, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, Walgreen Eastern Co., Actavis Kadian LLC, Rhonda's Pharmacy, LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, CVS Tennessee Distribution L.L.C., Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Allergan PLC, Anda, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Walmart Inc, Cardinal Health, Inc., Bypass Pharmacy, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership I, Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, CVS Indiana L.L.C., KVK Tech, Inc., Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Rite Aid of West Virginia, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS RX Services, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland Inc., NORAMCO, INC., Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse #45, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Wal-Mart Stores East, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., West Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Tasmanian Alkaloids Pty Ltd., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00073
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER: In light of the Motion to Withdraw #22 , the Emergency MOTION to Stay #19 re #17 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, filed by McKesson Corporation, is hereby ORDERED WITHDRAWN. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/13/2020. (JP)
May 12, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal,, #19 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #17 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Order on Public Motion,, Order on Motion to Transfer Case,,, Notice of Withdrawal (Meadows, John) Modified event type on 5/13/2020 (nmm).
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER: Plaintiff shall file its Response to the defendant's Emergency Motion to Stay #19 by May 8, 2020. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/6/2020. (JP)
May 5, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by City of Beckley, West Virginia re #19 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #17 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Order on Public Motion,, Order on Motion to Transfer Case,,, OF FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT IN STATE COURT AND REQUEST FOR A BRIEFING ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Majestro, Anthony)
May 5, 2020 Filing 19 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #17 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Order on Public Motion,, Order on Motion to Transfer Case,,, by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jessee, Russell)
May 4, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER from Deputy Clerk to Marshall County Circuit Clerk enclosing docket sheet and #17 Order Granting Motion to Remand. (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2020: #1 copy of letter returned Circuit Court Clerk) (nmm).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION TO REMAND: this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Marshall County, West Virginia; the plaintiffs #2 Motion to Join in Existing Mass Litigation and Certain Defendants #3 Motion to Transfer Venue are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/4/2020. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf; copy to Marshall Co. Cir. Clerk) (nmm)
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Beckley, West Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Majestro, Anthony)
April 28, 2020 Filing 15 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorney Ryan Q. Ashworth. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
April 27, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Bypass Pharmacy, Inc.. (Sellards, Robert)
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Jessee, Russell)
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue Certain Defendants' Reply in Support filed by McKesson Corporation. (Jessee, Russell)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attys. Harlow, Francisco and Orndorff (nmm)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jessee, Russell)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Wm. Scott Wickline (Wickline, Wm.)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE granting #7 Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule: McKesson's Response to #5 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand shall be due on or before April 27, 2020; Certain Defendants' Reply in Support of #3 Motion to Transfer Venue also shall be due on or before April 27, 2020; and Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its #5 Motion to Remand shall be due on or before May l, 2020. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/22/2020. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Enter Agreed Briefing Schedule re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #3 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion by City of Beckley, West Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Majestro, Anthony)
April 19, 2020 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #3 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue (Opposition) filed by City of Beckley, West Virginia. (Majestro, Anthony)
April 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Opposition to #3 Motion to Transfer Venue by City of Beckley, West Virginia. (Majestro, Anthony) Modified docket text and linked with additional motion on 4/20/2020 (nmm).
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attys. Benoit and Riaz (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by McKesson Corporation. (Jessee, Russell)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION TO JOIN IN EXISTING MASS LITIGATION by City of Beckley, West Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, part 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, part 2 - State Court Complaint continued, #3 Exhibit B - proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Marshall County, West Virginia, (case number 20-C-34), filed by McKesson Corporation. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-3025838. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court docket sheet, #2 Exhibit 2, part 1 - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2, part 2 - State Court Complaint continued, #4 Exhibit 3 - Motion to Join in Existing Mass Litigation, filed in State Court, #5 Exhibit 4 - Copy of Proofs of Service of Process on Bypass Pharmacy and Rhonda's Pharmacy, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Beckley, West Virginia v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: John J. Meadows
Represented By: Russell D. Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: Ftemkos J. Yianne
Represented By: Patricia M. Bello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: Sarah M. Benoit
Represented By: Wm. Scott Wickline
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Represented By: Bryant J. Spann
Represented By: Robert H Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda's Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Tennessee Distribution L.L.C.
Represented By: Carte P. Goodwin
Represented By: Joseph M Ward
Represented By: Alex J. Zurbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Represented By: Jennifer Winkler
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Neva G. Lusk
Represented By: Tai Shadrick Kluemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Robert Ruby
Represented By: Raymond S Franks, II
Represented By: Brian A Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bypass Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Sellards
Represented By: Ryan Q. Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Ftemkos J. Yianne
Represented By: Patricia M. Bello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Unaiza Riaz
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Represented By: Fazal A. Shere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Bryant J. Spann
Represented By: Robert H Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Represented By: Jennifer Winkler
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Bryant J. Spann
Represented By: Robert H Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Represented By: Carte P. Goodwin
Represented By: Joseph M Ward
Represented By: Alex J. Zurbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK Tech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Represented By: Jennifer Winkler
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Webster J. Arceneaux, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Represented By: Todd A. Mount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Candice M. Harlow
Represented By: Albert F. Sebok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Carte P. Goodwin
Represented By: Joseph M Ward
Represented By: Alex J. Zurbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Represented By: Carte P. Goodwin
Represented By: Joseph M Ward
Represented By: Alex J. Zurbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland Inc.
Represented By: Webster J. Arceneaux, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORAMCO, INC.
Represented By: Kelly C. Mowen
Represented By: Jon Barry Orndorff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse #45
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Represented By: Unaiza Riaz
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Represented By: Fazal A. Shere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East
Represented By: Neva G. Lusk
Represented By: Tai Shadrick Kluemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Carte P. Goodwin
Represented By: Joseph M Ward
Represented By: Alex J. Zurbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasmanian Alkaloids Pty Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Carte P. Goodwin
Represented By: Joseph M Ward
Represented By: Alex J. Zurbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ftemkos J. Yianne
Represented By: Patricia M. Bello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Represented By: Jennifer Winkler
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Beckley, West Virginia
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: J. Michael Benninger
Represented By: Shawn P. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?