Redden v. Mnuchin et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie D. Redden
Defendant: Charles Rettig, Dr. David Proctor, Kimberly Paton, Steven Mnuchin, Triston Tenney, Shelby Searls, Betsy Jividen and Jeff Sandy
Case Number: 5:2021cv00063
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 32 Copies and Certified Mailing fee for additional defendants: $ 89.10, receipt number WVNW002770. (ag)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY #28 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 6/24/2021. (ag)(pro se PLA cm rrr)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REGARDING PRELIMINARY REVIEW OF AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SERVICE OF PROCESS. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order, a copy of the Amended Complaint, and a completed 21 day summons to each defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, restricted delivery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 6/24/2021. (ag)(pro se PLA CM rrr)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION #27 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 6/24/2021. (ag)(pro se PLA cm rrr)
June 24, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Obtain Video (Security Camera) of Tuesday 19th of May, 2020 around 10:00am at Huttonsville Correctional Center in West Virginia by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ag)
June 24, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ag)
June 24, 2021 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kimberly Paton, David Proctor, Triston Tenney, Jeff Sandy, Betsy Jividen, Shelby Searls filed by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Section II Item B, #2 Attachment to Section II Item B.1, #3 Attachment to Section II Item B, #4 Attachment Conclusion to Section II Items B and B.1, #5 Attachment Prayer for Relief, #6 Exhibit 1 - Costs to Date, #7 Exhibit 2 - Grievance Form dated 6/7/2020, #8 Exhibit 3 - CDC Performing Broad-Based Testing for SARS-CoV-2 in Congregate Correctional, Detention, and Homeless Service udated 3/29/2021, #9 Exhibit 4 - Statement from Richard L. Hunt, #10 Exhibit 5 & 6, #11 Exhibit 7 - Statement from R. A. Runnen, #12 Exhibit 8 - Statement from Clayton McCartney, #13 Exhibit 9 - Statement from Danny Whetsell, #14 Envelope)(ag)
June 24, 2021 Filing 25 RETURN RECEIPT as to #22 Order on Public Motion. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/21/2021. (ag)
June 19, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM?ECF system to Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, July 19, 2021. Complete information regarding the WVND NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen Cm/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have thei r own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVND e-fling account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after July 19, 2021. Please log in to the WVND CM/ECF system at https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/ before July 19, 2021 to make sure you know your current WVND e-filing login and password. Do not rely on your username and password being saved in your web browser, because that method will not work with the NextGen upgrade. If you do not know your login or password or have any additional questions please call the WVND Clerks CM/ECF Office Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI)
June 17, 2021 Filing 24 Copies and Certified Mailing fee: $ 89.10, receipt number WVNW002766. (ag)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S CONSTRUED MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND PROVIDING HIM WITH 21 DAYS IN WHICH TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT: granting #20 Motion to add three defendants. The plaintiff must file an amended complaint on the Court-approved 1983 form. The plaintiff's amended complaint must be filed by 7/7/2021. Failure to file the amended complaint by that date will result in this Order being vacated. If an amended complaint is not filed, service of the original complaint must be accomplished by 7/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 6/16/2021. (ag)(pro se PLA cm rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2021: #1 1983 Complaint (blank), #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
June 14, 2021 Filing 23 LETTER from Ronnie Redden to Clerk regarding #16 Order, enclosing fee for copies of complaint and service of summons. (ag)
June 14, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to add three defendants by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ag)
June 3, 2021 Filing 19 RETURN RECEIPT re #13 , #14 , #15 , #16 Orders and 17 Summons. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/1/2021. (ag)
May 30, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on July 19, 2021. Complete information regarding the WVND NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found #here.Currently, many attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. This will no longer be allowed with the New WVND NextGen CM/ECF system because each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to their e-filing account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WVND e-filing attorneys once the WVND NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account, and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the WVND e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cant be completed until on or after July 19, 2021. The first step is to check and see if your PACER account is an upgraded PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have un upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the WVND NextGen CM/ECF upgrade occurs on July 19, 2021: 1) You have a an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court; or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WVND CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Additional notices will be sent later detailing how to handle the second step in this process. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the WVND Clerks Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI)
May 28, 2021 Filing 18 RETURN RECEIPT as to #12 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/26/2021. (ag)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING PRELIMINARY REVIEW AND SERVICE OF PROCESS. The plaintiff is responsible for obtaining service of process on his own; service must be accomplished by July 26, 2021. If the plaintiff prefers to have the Clerk of Court serve the defendants he must pay the applicable fees in advance; Payment of $89.10 must be made by Treasury Check or Money Order payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 5/26/2021. (ag)(pro se PLA CM rrr; Financial Admin. cm/ecf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO VERIFY DEFENDANTS #8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 5/26/2021. (ag)(pro se PLA CM rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION #3 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 5/26/2021. (ag)(pro se PLA CM rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL #2 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 5/26/2021. (ag)(pro se PLA CM rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TERMINATING TWO DEFENDANTS: Steven Mnuchin and Charles Rettig terminated. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/24/2021. (ag)(pro se PLA CM rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/19/2021. (ag)
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTION BY PLAINTIFF per #9 Order filed by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ag)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO TAKE SPECIFIC ACTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 5/17/2021. (ag)(pro se PLA CM rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to verify defendants by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9 - Inmate Interview Request, #2 Envelope)(ag)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number WVNC003181. (ag)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from Ronnie D. Redden to Clerk with filing fee enclosed. The check was for the wrong amount. Clerk returned check to Trustee Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 1983 Packet) (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2021: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to File Extended Paperwork by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ronnie D. Redden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Grievance dated 3/5/21, #2 Exhibit 2 - Grievance dated 6/7/20, #3 Exhibit 3 - Covid-19 information, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter from Oscar Ross Combs, Jr. re: impact payments, #5 Exhibit 7 - Covid-19 testing info, #6 Exhibit 8 - EIP payment info, #7 Exhibit 9 - Covid-19 testing info, #8 Envelope) (No Exhibits labeled 5-6 were received) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redden v. Mnuchin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. David Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triston Tenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby Searls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Jividen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie D. Redden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?