Hafco Foundry and Machine Company, Incorporated v. GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc.

Plaintiff: Hafco Foundry and Machine Company, Incorporated
Defendant: GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv16143
Filed: December 15, 2015
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Bluefield Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: David A. Faber
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2018 104 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 103 Memorandum & Opinion: Setting forth the reasons for the Court's 98 Order entered 3/30/2018 wherein the Court GRANTED Hafco's MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Given the Court's 99 ruling on GMS 's MOTION for a New Trial, Hafco's MOTION for Enhanced Damages, Attorney Fees, Prejudgment Interest and Post-Judgment Interest was DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 4/12/2018. (cc: counsel of record) (mk)
April 10, 2018 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION setting forth the reasons for the court's 98 Order entered on 3/30/2018 wherein the court GRANTED Hafco's motion for preliminary injunction. Given the court's 99 ruling on GMS's motion for a new trial, Hafco's motion for enhanced damages, attorney fees, prejudgment interest and post-judgment interest was DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 4/10/2018. (cc: counsel of record) (arb)
March 30, 2018 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's 94 motion for judgment as a matter of law or, in the alternative, a new trial is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: 1) The Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law is denied in its entire ty; and 2) The alternative Motion for a New Trial is granted insofar as the court grants a new trial nisi remittitur. Hafco shall agree to remit damages in excess of $0 by filing a document no later than Thursday, 4/5/2018, indicating that it agrees to the remittitur. Failure to do so will result in the Court granting a new trial on the issue of damages. The motion for a new trial is denied in all other respects. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 3/30/2018. (cc: attys) (mk)
May 16, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: At the final status conference prior to jury selection, held on 5/15/2017, the court indicated that Plaintiff's 69 additional Motion in Limine would be GRANTED but that defendant could ask the court to revisit it s ruling should circumstances arise that made doing so proper. This ruling does not affect Defendant's right to assert a defense of patent invalidity under 35 U.S.C. § 282. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 5/16/2017. (cc: counsel of record) (mk)
May 18, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying plaintiff's 12 MOTION to Transfer. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 5/18/2016. (cc: counsel of record) (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hafco Foundry and Machine Company, Incorporated v. GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hafco Foundry and Machine Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Andrew G. Fusco
Represented By: Dylan C. Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?