Cleckley v. Rickard
Petitioner: Freddie Cleckley
Respondent: Barbara Rickard
Case Number: 1:2018cv01363
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received on 11/13/2018 by United States Attorney re: #8 Order to Show Cause; no signature given. (arb)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Timothy D. Boggess appearing on behalf of Barbara Rickard. (Boggess, Timothy)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241): Respondent is to answer or otherwise respond to the Petition within 60 days of the entry of this Order. Petitioner may, if he wishes, file a reply to the answer or response of the Respondent within 60 days after service of same by the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/9/2018. (Attachment: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (cc: Petitioner, pro se; USA w/copy of Section 2241 Petition and Memorandum in Support, via cert. mail, RRR; Respondent w/copy of Section 2241 Petition and Memorandum in Support) (arb)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number 1BLUE001483. (arb)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: Petitioner's #5 Response to #3 Court's Notice of Failure to Remit Filing Fee. The Petitioner's request for an extension of time to pay the $5.00 filing fee is GRANTED. Petitioner shall have through and including 11/30/2018 in which to pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/2/2018. (cc: Petitioner) (mk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE by Freddie Cleckley to the Court's #3 Notice to Petitioner of Failure to Remit Filing Fee. (arb)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
October 18, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PETITIONER OF FAILURE TO REMIT FILING FEE. (mk)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Freddie Cleckley in support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (mk)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Freddie Cleckley against Barbara Rickard pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleckley v. Rickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barbara Rickard
Represented By: Timothy D. Boggess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Freddie Cleckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?