Masters v. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tyler Masters
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01416
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 LETTER-FORM ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Mercer County Circuit Court, acknowledging receipt of case remanded on 12/21/2018. (mk) (Modified text on 1/2/2019) (slr).
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER to Clerk of Court, Mercer County Circuit Court, from Clerk, USDC, dated 12/20/2018, re: remand of case. (arb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #10 Order Remanding Case to counsel of record. (arb)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REMANDING CASE: For good cause shown, and for the reasons stated in the Joint Stipulation for Remand, this case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Mercer County, West Virginia, as Civil Action No. 18-C-250, and shall be removed from this Court's active docket. Based upon the parties' agreement, Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees and costs related to the Motion to Remand are denied. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 12/20/2018. (cc: counsel of record) (arb)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 JOINT STIPULATION FOR REMAND by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Tyler Masters (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Pentino, Denise) (Modified on 12/21/2018 to add party filer)(ts).
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company in opposition to #5 MOTION by Tyler Masters to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mercer County (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Pentino, Denise)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING by Tyler Masters re: #5 MOTION by Tyler Masters to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mercer County (Buckner, Eric)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Tyler Masters in support of #5 MOTION by Tyler Masters to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mercer County (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Buckner, Eric)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION by Tyler Masters to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mercer County (Buckner, Eric)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting is 12/19/2018. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting is 1/2/2019. Scheduling Conference at 10:00 AM on 1/7/2019 in Bluefield before the undersigned. Entry of Scheduling Order by 1/14/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures is 1/21/2019. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 11/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented parties) (arb)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Pentino, Denise)
November 8, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mk)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company with summons, complaint, docket sheet, notice of removal and auto policy declarations from Circuit Court of Mercer County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #CHAR015108. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masters v. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Masters
Represented By: Eric J. Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Denise D. Pentino
Represented By: Jacob Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?