Gresham et al v. NSC Plan Administrator/Trustees Board Mgrs. - Retirement Plans Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Lathronea P. Gresham and John M. Gresham
Defendant: U. S. Railroad Retirement Board Pensions, NSC Plan Administrator/Trustees Board Mgrs. - Retirement Plans Norfolk Southern Corporation and U. S. RRB Members/Chair/OIG Pensions and Annuities
Case Number: 1:2018cv01426
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from Lathronea P. Gresham re: #5 Letter returning documents. Signed by L. Gresham on 12/5/18. (mk)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER to Lathronea P. Gresham, from Clerk, U.S. District Court, SDWV, dated 11/20/2018, returning copy of document per Judge Faber's Memorandum Opinion and Order entered 4/12/2016 re: Case Nos. 1:92-cv-01003 and 1:92-cv-01004, via cert mail, RRR. Original document #4 filed in Case No. 1:18-cv-01426 per direction of the Court. (Attachment: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (mk)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Showing Cause why Defendants are Liable to Plaintiffs and Fraud Upon Court by Its Officers, by/on Behalf of Ds, Include Intervenors RRB, U.S. EEOC, WV AGO, et al, by John M. Gresham, Lathronea P. Gresham. (mk)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re: #1 Complaint: Plaintiffs have not filed an Application to Proceed Without Payment of Fees and Costs or paid the filing fee of $400. Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to submit an Application to Proceed Without Payment of Fees and Costs, or in the alternative, pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 11/16/2018. (cc: Plaintiffs, w/Form Complaint and Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees) (mk)
November 15, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mk)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 LETTER FORM COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gresham et al v. NSC Plan Administrator/Trustees Board Mgrs. - Retirement Plans Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Railroad Retirement Board Pensions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSC Plan Administrator/Trustees Board Mgrs. - Retirement Plans Norfolk Southern Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. RRB Members/Chair/OIG Pensions and Annuities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lathronea P. Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?