Canty v. Caruthers et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Canty
Defendant: P.A. Chandra Caruthers, Mr S. Bret Whitfield, Ms. Kell Lucas, P.A. Ms Chandra Caruthers and Mr. Adam Meade
Case Number: 1:2018cv01459
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 ORIGINAL APPLICATION by Anthony Canty to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs returned by Petitioner with Certificate portion completed. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (arb)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis be returned to Plaintiff, that Plaintiff submit a complete Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis including all information contained in the Certificate portion of the Application, and return such to the Court on or before 12/21/2018. In the alternative to fully completing the Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Plaintiff may pay the Court's $400.00 filing fee. Failure of the Plaintiff to either pay the filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by 12/21/2018 will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this matter without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 11/21/2018. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se with #1 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis for his completion) (arb)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT by Anthony Canty (Attachment: #1 Inmate Statement) (arb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Anthony Canty (arb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 AUTHORIZATION TO RELEASE INSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND TO PAY FILING FEE by Anthony Canty (arb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW and Chronological Occurrances [sic] of Medical Treatment and Medical Neglect in Reference to Anthony Canty 16776424 (arb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (arb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Anthony Canty to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (arb)
November 19, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canty v. Caruthers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Canty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A. Chandra Caruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr S. Bret Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Kell Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A. Ms Chandra Caruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Adam Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?