Brecht v. Warden

Petitioner: Michael Sean Brecht
Respondent: United States of America and Warden
Case Number: 1:2019cv00054
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
1 Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from Vicky Dickerson on behalf of the USA re: #4 Order to Show Cause. (arb)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Timothy D. Boggess appearing on behalf of United States of America. (Boggess, Timothy)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241): The Clerk is directed to substitute as Respondent, Warden, FCI McDowell in place of the United States of America and update the case style accordingly. Respondent shall answer or otherwise respond to the Petition within 60 days of the entry of this Order showing cause, if he/she has any, why the relief sought by Petitioner should not be granted. Petitioner may, if he wishes, file a reply to the answer or response of the Respondent within 60 days after service of same by the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/24/2019. (Attachment: #1 Certified Mail Receipt-USA) (cc: Petitioner, USA and Respondent w/2241 Petition) (arb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
January 18, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER RESPONSE to Michael Sean Brecht, from Clerk, USDC, dated 1/18/2019, enclosing a file stamped copy of the first page of his Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (arb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Michael Sean Brecht against United States of America pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. Filing Fee $5. Receipt # 1BLUE001510. (Attachments: #1 Receipt for Filing Fee, #2 Cover Letter & Envelope) (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brecht v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Timothy D. Boggess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Sean Brecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?