Jennings v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Ross Alan Jennings
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00099
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
1 Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Ross Alan Jennings for service upon Nancy A. Berryhill, re: #2 Complaint . Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. Person Served: Vicky Dickerson. Return Receipt Card for Attorney General signed on 2/21/2019. Return Receipt Card for Commissioner of Social Security signed on 2/20/2019. (Lefler, Derrick) (Modified on 3/1/2019 to add first page of Summons. (lca).
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nancy A. Berryhill re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (arb)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF COSTS AND FEES: The Court GRANTS plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. The Clerk shall issue the summonses and plaintiff shall serve the Summons and Complaint. The recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs and fees taxed against the plaintiff and pay the balance to the plaintiff and his attorney, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 2/12/2019. (cc: plaintiff and counsel of record) (arb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
February 8, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (arb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Ross Alan Jennings to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Alan Jennings
Represented By: Derrick W. Lefler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?