Atwell v. Tractor Supply Company, et al

Plaintiff: Marty Atwell
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company and Mary Morgan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00105
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marty Atwell for First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Tractor Supply Company - 2. (Bigelow, Brian)
March 26, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marty Atwell for First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Tractor Supply Company. (Bigelow, Brian)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER: Setting forth the terms for the handling of confidential documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/21/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (arb)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AGREED ORDER Governing the Inadvertent Disclosure of Documents or Other Material Under Rule 502(d): Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) and the agreement of the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that the procedures set forth herein shall govern the inadvertent production of privileged or confidential documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/21/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (arb)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING DEPOSITION PROTOCOL: The parties have agreed to a protocol governing the taking of depositions in this case. Therefore, it is ORDERED that the protocol set forth herein shall be followed with all depositions conducted herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/21/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (arb)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 5/2/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 9/11/2019, and all depositions by 10/28/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 8/28/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 9/27/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 10/15/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 11/18/2019, with responses and replies due thereafter in accordance with the Local Rules. Mediation to be concluded by 11/27/2019. Settlement Meeting to be held by 2/3/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 1/24/2020, with responses due by 2/7/2020. Plaintiff's portion of the Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due to defendants by 2/7/2020, who shall then prepare and complete the opposing portion thereof and submit the Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order to the Court for entry by 2/14/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Bluefield before Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. Proposed Jury Charge due by 3/2/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 10:00 AM on 3/6/2020 in Bluefield. Jury Trial set for 3/9/2020 at 09:30 AM in Bluefield before Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/21/2019. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented party) (arb)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: With the consent of the parties, the court specifically designates Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including jury trial and entry of final judgment. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 3/21/2019. (cc: Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn, counsel of record and any unrepresented parties) (arb)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 9:30 AM on 4/2/2019 is CANCELLED. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 3/21/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (arb)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Mary Morgan, Tractor Supply Company of Marty Atwell on May 23, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (George, Edward)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Morgan, Tractor Supply Company for First Discovery to Plaintiff. (George, Edward)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER Setting Deposition Protocol by Mary Morgan, Tractor Supply Company (George, Edward)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED AGREED ORDER Governing The Inadvertent Disclosure of Documents oR Other Material Under Rule 502(d) by Mary Morgan, Tractor Supply Company (George, Edward)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER/PROTECTIVE ORDER by Mary Morgan, Tractor Supply Company (George, Edward)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Mary Morgan, Tractor Supply Company, Marty Atwell. (Attachments: #1 Planning Meeting Worksheet, #2 Addendum to Report)(George, Edward) (Modified on 3/21/2019 to add party filer) (mk).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting is 3/21/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting is 3/28/2019. Scheduling Conference at 09:30 AM on 4/2/2019 in Bluefield before the undersigned. Entry of Scheduling Order by 4/11/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures is 4/22/2019. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 2/21/2019. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented parties) (arb)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand by Mary Morgan, Tractor Supply Company.(George, Edward) (Modified on 2/18/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand)(ts).
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb)
February 11, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tractor Supply Company with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Mercer County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7068386. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atwell v. Tractor Supply Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company
Represented By: Arden J. Cogar, Jr.
Represented By: Edward Taylor George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Morgan
Represented By: Arden J. Cogar, Jr.
Represented By: Edward Taylor George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Atwell
Represented By: Benjamin N. Hatfield
Represented By: Robert D. Cline, Jr.
Represented By: Brian E. Bigelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?