Rose v. Saul
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Rose
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00557
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Mary Ann Rose for service upon Andrew Saul, re: #1 Complaint. Andrew Saul served on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Person Served: Sharon White. Return Receipt Card for Attorney General signed on 8/6/2019. Return Receipt Card for Commissioner of Social Security signed on 8/5/2019. (Dils, Jan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE by Mary Ann Rose to the Court's #4 Order. (Dils, Jan)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Counsel is DIRECTED to file with the Court a pleading certifying whether Dr. Kropac is or is not involved in this matter. Should Dr. Kropac be involved, the undersigned will direct that the Clerk rotate this matter to another Magistrate Judge in the District. Counsel is ORDERED to file said pleading no later than 8/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/31/2019. (cc: counsel of record or parties acting pro se) (arb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
July 30, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (arb)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7334466. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Rose
Represented By: Jan Dils
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?