Yates v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Meredith Yates
Defendant: Dr. Robert Lee Wheeler, Greenbrier Physicians Inc. and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00564
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION by Meredith Yates to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (mk)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #1 MOTION for Permission to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall have 20 days from the date of entry of this Order to either pay the Court's filing and administrative fees totaling $400 or obtain approval to proceed in forma pauperis or without prepayment of fees. Failure of Plaintiff to comply with this directive will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this matter without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 8/5/2019. (cc: Plaintiff w/form Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Authorization to Release Institutional Account Information and to Pay Filing Fee) (arb)
August 2, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COMPLAINT. (arb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION by Meredith Yates for Permission to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope) (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Robert Lee Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbrier Physicians Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?