McVay v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Franklin Tuck McVay
Defendant: United States, Federal Bureau of Prisons (BOP) and Mid-Atlantic Regional Office
Case Number: 1:2020cv00064
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Mid-Atlantic Regional Office Director re: #11 Summons Issued as to USA. Person Served: Signature illegible. (Attachment: #1 Mid-Atlantic Regional Office Director Summons) (arb)
May 4, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Federal Bureau of Prisons (BOP) Director re: #11 Summons Issued as to USA. Person Served: Signature illegible. (Attachment: #1 Federal Bureau of Prisons (BOP) Director Summons) (arb)
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for United States, United States Department of Justice re: #11 Summons Issued as to USA. Person Served: Eddie L. Anderson. (Attachment: #1 United States, United States Department of Justice Summons) (arb)
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Attorney General of the United States re: #11 Summons Issued as to USA. Person Served: Eddie L. Anderson. (Attachment: #1 Attorney General Summons) (arb)
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for United States Attorney re: #11 Summons Issued as to USA. United States Attorney served on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. Person Served: Robin Justice. (Attachment: #1 U. S. Attorney Summons) (arb)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Franklin Tuck McVay for United States, United States Department of Justice; Federal Bureau of Prisons (BOP) Director; Mid-Atlantic Regional Office Director; Attorney General of the United States; and United States Attorney re: #2 Complaint and #9 Exhibits in Support of Complaint; returnable 60 days; sent by Clerk's Office via cert. mail, RRR, restricted delivery. (Attachments: #1 FBOP Director Summons, #2 Mid-Atlantic Director Summons, #3 Atty. General Summons, #4 U. S. Attorney Summons, #5 Certified Mail Receipts (5)) (arb)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 Partial Filing Fee Received: $42.99, Receipt Number CHAR017324. (mk)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 EXHIBITS by Franklin Tuck McVay in support of #2 Complaint (filed pursuant to #8 Order). (arb)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 MOTION to Present Evidence. The Clerk is directed to docket Plaintiff's above #7 Motion and [7-1] Exhibits as a new docket entry entitled "Exhibits in Support of Complaint." Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 4/21/2020. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se and counsel of record) (arb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 Pro Se MOTION by Franklin Tuck McVay to Present Evidence. (Attachments: #1 Documented Evidence for Court Records, #2 Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (mk)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Plaintiff is ORDERED to send payment of the amount of $42.99 to the Office of the Clerk of this Court within 30 days of the entry of this Order; directing the Clerk to issue process promptly upon receipt of Plaintiff's initial partial payment of the filing fee; directing Plaintiff to make monthly payments as more fully described herein, until he has paid the total filing fee of $350.00; directing Plaintiff to notify the Court by writing, within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order, is he does not wish to pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/10/2020. (cc: Plaintiff, counsel of record and Trustee Officer at USP Florence) (arb)
January 27, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT by Franklin Tuck McVay (arb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT to Collection of Fees From Trust Account by Franklin Tuck McVay (arb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (arb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Franklin Tuck McVay to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McVay v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons (BOP)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Atlantic Regional Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Tuck McVay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?