Kestner v. Crandall et al
Plaintiff: Ethan Kestner
Defendant: R+L Truckload Services, L.L.C., R&L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C., R & L Carriers, Inc., R & L Transfer, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. and James R. Crandall
Case Number: 1:2020cv00323
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL of Defendants R & L Carriers, Inc. and R+L Truckload Services, L.L.C. by Ethan Kestner, R & L Carriers, Inc., R+L Truckload Services, L.L.C. (Bigelow, Brian) (Modified on 7/4/2020 to add party filers) (ts).
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by R & L Carriers, Inc., R & L Truckload Services, L.L.C. in support of #12 MOTION by R & L Carriers, Inc., R & L Truckload Services, L.L.C. to Dismiss #1 Complaint (DeMasters, Peter) (Modified on 6/22/2020 to correct party filers) (ts)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by R & L Carriers, Inc., R & L Truckload Services, L.L.C. to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (DeMasters, Peter) (Modified on 6/22/2020 to add link to #1 complaint and correct party filers) (ts).
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by James R. Crandall.(DeMasters, Peter) (Modified on 6/19/2020 to add jury demand) (ts).
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/28/2020 as to R&L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002709119. (arb)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/28/2020 as to R+L Truckload Services, L.L.C. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002709102. (arb)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/28/2020 as to R & L Carriers, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002709096. (arb)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/28/2020 as to R & L Transfer, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002709089. (arb)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/28/2020 as to Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002709072. (arb)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/28/2020 as to James R. Crandall. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002709065. (arb)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James R. Crandall, Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R & L Transfer, Inc., R & L Carriers, Inc., R+L Truckload Services, L.L.C. and R&L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C. re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Greenwood Motor Lines Summons, #2 R & L Transfer Summons, #3 R & L Carriers Summons, #4 R+L Truckload Services Summons, #5 R&L Carriers Shared Services Summons) (arb)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Ethan Kestner for James R. Crandall, Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R & L Carriers, Inc., R & L Transfer, Inc., R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C., R&L Truckload Services, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Bigelow, Brian)
May 7, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7612476 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Crandall Proposed Summons, #3 Greenwood Motor Lines Proposed Summons, #4 R & L Transfer Proposed Summons, #5 R & L Carriers Proposed Summons, #6 R+L Truckload Services Proposed Summons, #7 R&L Carriers Shared Services Proposed Summons) (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kestner v. Crandall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R+L Truckload Services, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & L Carriers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & L Transfer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Kestner
Represented By: Stephen B. Farmer
Represented By: Robert A. Campbell
Represented By: Brian E. Bigelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?