Benson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Ray Benson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00411
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 RESET ANSWER DEADLINE as to Andrew Saul for 8/22/2020 pursuant to #8 Summons Returned in a Social Security Case. (ts)
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Ray Benson for service upon Andrew Saul, Andrew Saul served on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/22/2020. Person Served: V. Dickerson. Return Receipt Card for Attorney General signed on 6/24/2020. Return Receipt Card for Commissioner of Social Security signed on 6/24/2020. (Lefler, Derrick) (Modified on 6/29/2020 to correct answer date) (ts).
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Ray Benson to the Court's #5 Order. (Lefler, Derrick)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (arb)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Counsel is DIRECTED to file with the Court a pleading certifying whether Dr. Kropac is or is not involved in this matter. Should Dr. Kropac be involved, the undersigned will direct that the Clerk rotate this matter to another Magistrate Judge in the District. Counsel is ORDERED to file said pleading no later than 7/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 6/18/2020. (cc: counsel of record or parties acting pro se) (arb)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS: The Court GRANTS plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. The Clerk of Court shall issue the summons(es) and plaintiff shall serve the summons(es) and complaint. The recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs taxed against plaintiff and pay the balance to plaintiff and plaintiff's attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 6/18/2020. (cc: counsel of record) (arb)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
June 17, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Summons) (arb)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Ray Benson to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Benson
Represented By: Derrick W. Lefler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?