Hancock v. United States
Plaintiff: Gary Hancock
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 1:2020cv00483
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gary Hancock; system updated. (arb)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File his Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. To the extent Plaintiff requests an extension of time, Plaintiff's #4 Motion is GRANTED. To the extent Plaintiff requests a 90-day extension of time, Plaintiff's #4 Motion is DENIED. Plaintiff shall either pay the filing and administrative fee totaling $400 or file an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fee or Costs by 10/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/29/2020. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (arb)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Gary Hancock for Extension of Time. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (mk)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff shall either pay the filing and administrative fee totaling $400 or file an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by 8/14/2020. Failure to comply with this directive will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this matter without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/17/2020. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se w/blank Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) (arb)
July 16, 2020 CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?