Weems-Bey v. Kemper
Plaintiff: Adrian Weems Bey and Adrian Weems-Bey
Defendant: Kemper and Mr. Kemper
Case Number: 1:2021cv00069
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND JUDGMENT ORDER This action is DISMISSED without prejudice and the Clerk is directed to remove this action from the docket of the court. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 2/17/2021. (cc: any unrepresented party) (mk)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Adrian Weems-Bey to Drop #1 Letter/Complaint (mk)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION that the District Court DISMISS Plaintiff's #1 Complaint and remove this matter from the Court's docket. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. If the PF&R was served electronically, Objections are due by 2/16/2021. If the PF&R was served by mail, Objections are due by 2/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 2/1/2021. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (mk)
January 27, 2021 CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mk)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 LETTER-FORM COMPLAINT. (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weems-Bey v. Kemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Weems Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Weems-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?