Thompson v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Gregory Allen Thompson
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2023cv00514
Filed: August 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held before the Administrative Law Judge. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation)(Bailey, Jason)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. The recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs and fees taxed against Plaintiff and pay the balance to Plaintiff and his attorney, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/2/2023. (cc: counsel of record) (arb)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (arb)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 APPLICATION by Gregory Allen Thompson to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Allen Thompson
Represented By: Robert J. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Office of General
Represented By: William S. Thompson, United States Attorney
Represented By: Jason S. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?