Ario Minerals LLC et al v. Diversified Production LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ario Minerals LLC, Big Huff Minerals LLC, Courtney Minerals LLC, Mingo Minerals LLC, Mohler Minerals LLC, Pardee Minerals Holding Company LLC, Pardee Oil & Gas LLC, Pardee Resources Company, Pardee Royalty LLC, PLC Minerals LLC and Powellton Minerals LLC
Defendant: Diversified Production LLC doing business as Alliance Petroleum Corporation, Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation and Diversified Energy Company PLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00522
Filed: August 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JOINT MOTION by Diversified Energy Company PLC, Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation, Diversified Production LLC, Ario Minerals LLC, Big Huff Minerals LLC, Courtney Minerals LLC, Mingo Minerals LLC, Mohler Minerals LLC, Pardee Minerals Holding Company LLC, Pardee Oil & Gas LLC, Pardee Resources Company, Pardee Royalty LLC, PLC Minerals LLC, Powellton Minerals LLC for Stay (Smith, Amy) (Modified on 9/28/2023 to add party filers) (mk).
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: The amendment of any pleading and the joinder of any party shall be completed no later than 10/30/2023. The parties shall complete all discovery requests by 3/4/2024, and all depositions by 4/18/2024. Expert witnesses: The party bearing the burden of proof shall make the disclosures no later than 2/19/2024. The party not bearing burden of proof shall make disclosures by 3/19/2024. All parties shall provide the disclosures to solely contradict or rebut evidence no later than 4/4/2024. All dispositive motions, except those filed under Rule 12(b), shall be filed and served by 5/8/2024, with responses and replies due thereafter in accordance with the Local Rules. Any mediation scheduled by the parties must be concluded by 5/20/2024. No later than 7/15/2024, parties and their counsel shall meet to conduct settlement negotiations. All motions in limine shall be filed and served by 7/22/2024, with responses due by 7/29/2024. Plaintiffs' portion of the proposed integrated pretrial order is due to opposing counsel by 7/19/2024, who shall then prepare the opposing portion thereof and submit the proposed integrated pretrial order no later than 7/29/2024. A final pretrial conference shall be held at 2:00 PM, on 8/5/2024, in Bluefield. Proposed charge to the jury submitted by 9/5/2024. A final settlement conference shall be held at 10:00 AM, on 9/9/2024, in Bluefield. Trial of this action shall be held at 9:30 AM, on 9/10/2024, in Bluefield. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 9/19/2023. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented party) (arb)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER cancelling the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 9/29/2023. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 9/19/2023. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented party) (arb)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Diversified Energy Company PLC, Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation, Diversified Production LLC, Ario Minerals LLC, Big Huff Minerals LLC, Courtney Minerals LLC, Mingo Minerals LLC, Mohler Minerals LLC, Pardee Minerals Holding Company LLC, Pardee Oil & Gas LLC, Pardee Royalty LLC, PLC Minerals LLC, Powellton Minerals LLC. (Attachment: #1 Worksheet for Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(Smith, Amy) (Modified on 9/18/2023 to add party filers) (kew).
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by Diversified Energy Company PLC, Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation, Diversified Production LLC in support of #24 MOTION by Diversified Energy Company PLC, Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation, Diversified Production LLC to Dismiss With Prejudice re: #21 Amended Complaint (Turner, Lauren)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION by Diversified Energy Company PLC, Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation, Diversified Production LLC to Dismiss With Prejudice re: #21 Amended Complaint. (Turner, Lauren) (Modified on 9/15/2023 to add link to #21 amended complaint) (mk).
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Brian Jarrett Warner (Warner, Brian) (Modified on 9/11/2023 to convert event to notice of change of attorney information) (mk).
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Diversified Energy Company PLC, Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation, Diversified Production LLC to respond to the #21 Amended Complaint to 9/15/2023 and for Ario Minerals LLC, Big Huff Minerals LLC, Courtney Minerals LLC, Mingo Minerals LLC, Mohler Minerals LLC, Pardee Minerals Holding Company LLC, Pardee Oil & Gas LLC, Pardee Resources Company, Pardee Royalty LLC, PLC Minerals LLC, Powellton Minerals LLC to respond to Motion to Dismiss to 10/2/2023 by Diversified Energy Company PLC, Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation, Diversified Production LLC, Ario Minerals LLC, Big Huff Minerals LLC, Courtney Minerals LLC, Mingo Minerals LLC, Mohler Minerals LLC, Pardee Minerals Holding Company LLC, Pardee Oil & Gas LLC, Pardee Resources Company, Pardee Royalty LLC, PLC Minerals LLC, Powellton Minerals LLC (Smith, Amy) (Modified on 9/1/2023 to add party filers) (mk).
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order SET ANSWER DEADLINE for Diversified Energy Company PLC, Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation, Diversified Production LLC to 9/15/2023 pursuant to #22 Stipulation. (mk)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Ario Minerals LLC, Big Huff Minerals LLC, Courtney Minerals LLC, Mingo Minerals LLC, Mohler Minerals LLC, Pardee Minerals Holding Company LLC, Pardee Oil & Gas LLC, Pardee Resources Company, Pardee Royalty LLC, PLC Minerals LLC, Powellton Minerals LLC against Diversified Production LLC Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation, Diversified Energy Company PLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (mk)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Powellton Minerals LLC (McCuskey, John)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff PLC Minerals LLC (McCuskey, John)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Mohler Minerals LLC (McCuskey, John)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Mingo Minerals LLC (McCuskey, John)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Courtney Minerals LLC (McCuskey, John)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Big Huff Minerals LLC (McCuskey, John)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Ario Minerals LLC (McCuskey, John)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Pardee Oil & Gas LLC (McCuskey, John)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Pardee Royalty LLC (McCuskey, John)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Pardee Resources Company (McCuskey, John)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Pardee Minerals Holding Company LLC (McCuskey, John)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE: Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 9/15/2023. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) meeting and Scheduling Order Worksheet - 9/22/2023. Scheduling conference at 2:00 PM on 9/29/2023, in Bluefield, West Virginia, before the undersigned. Entry of Scheduling Order - 10/6/2023. Last day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 10/16/2023. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 8/16/2023. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented parties) (arb)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Diversified Energy Company PLC, Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation, Diversified Production LLC in support of #7 MOTION by Diversified Energy Company PLC, Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation, Diversified Production LLC to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Turner, Lauren)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION by Diversified Energy Company PLC, Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation, Diversified Production LLC to Dismiss With Prejudice re: Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Turner, Lauren) (Modified on 8/11/2023 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (mk).
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants Diversified Energy Company PLC (Turner, Lauren) (Modified on 8/7/2023 to correct party filer) (mk).
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation (Turner, Lauren) (Modified on 8/7/2023 to correct party filer) (mk).
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Diversified Production LLC (Turner, Lauren) (Modified on 8/7/2023 to correct party filer) (mk).
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROOF OF NOTICE of Removal and Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court by Diversified Energy Company PLC, Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation, Diversified Production LLC (Attachment: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Turner, Lauren)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diversified Production LLC, Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation and Diversified Energy Company PLC with summonses, complaint, notice of bona fide defense, and docket sheet from Circuit Court of McDowell County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8471183. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (arb)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ario Minerals LLC et al v. Diversified Production LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ario Minerals LLC
Represented By: Michael Quinlan
Represented By: Brian Jarrett Warner
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Huff Minerals LLC
Represented By: Brian Jarrett Warner
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Michael Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Minerals LLC
Represented By: Brian Jarrett Warner
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Michael Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mingo Minerals LLC
Represented By: Brian Jarrett Warner
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Michael Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohler Minerals LLC
Represented By: Brian Jarrett Warner
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Michael Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pardee Minerals Holding Company LLC
Represented By: Brian Jarrett Warner
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Michael Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pardee Oil & Gas LLC
Represented By: Brian Jarrett Warner
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Michael Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pardee Resources Company
Represented By: Brian Jarrett Warner
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Michael Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pardee Royalty LLC
Represented By: Brian Jarrett Warner
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Michael Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLC Minerals LLC
Represented By: Brian Jarrett Warner
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Michael Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Powellton Minerals LLC
Represented By: Brian Jarrett Warner
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Michael Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Production LLC doing business as Alliance Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Shaina Leigh Richardson
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: Lauren K. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Gas & Oil Corporation
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: Lauren K. Turner
Represented By: Shaina Leigh Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Energy Company PLC
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: Lauren K. Turner
Represented By: Shaina Leigh Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?