Love v. United States of America
Petitioner: Tawayne Devone Love
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2008cv00192
Filed: March 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: Joseph R. Goodwin
Presiding Judge: Mary E. Stanley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 735 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER for the reasons set forth herein, the Court GRANTS Movant's 704 letter-form motion to extend time to file; 724 motion for leave to file an affidavit in support of his § 2255 motion; and 730 motion to expan d the record. The Court DENIES Movant's 700 motion to reconsider and hold proceedings in abeyance; 705 letter-form motion to reconsider order reassigning case; 706 , 708 and 713 motions to amend; 707 motion to re-open previously deci ded issues; 714 motion to continue; 715 motion for judicial notice; 716 motion to submit interrogatories; 717 motion to compel; 719 motion for sanctions; 721 letter-form motion to seal; 729 motion to delay ruling as moot; 730 motion t o expand the record; and 732 motion to supplement the petition. The Court OVERRULES Movant's objections, ADOPTS the 699 Second Proposed Findings & Recommendation to the extent it is consistent with this Opinion, DENIES Movant's 564 and 592 § 2255 Petition and DIRECTS the Clerk to remove this case from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/30/2014. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented party) (skh)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 673 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER adopting the 666 Proposed Findings and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; denying petitioner's pending 538 , 564 , 592 , 637 , 642 , 652 , and 660 Motions; denying a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/16/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 666 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION as to Tawayne Devone Love; recommending that movant's 538 Amended Motion to Dismiss, 564 Petition, 592 2255 Motion, 637 Motion for Summary Judgment, 642 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing, 652 MOTION for Sanctions, and 660 MOTION to Alter and/or Amend the Original Petition, be denied and this matter dismissed from the docket. Cross Reference Criminal Case Number 2:03-00187-01. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Mary E. Stanley. Objections to Proposed F&R due by 11/20/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary E. Stanley on 11/2/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tawayne Devone Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Charles T. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?