Equitable Gathering Equity, LLC et al v. Fountain Place, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Equitable Gathering Equity, LLC and Equitable Production Company |
Defendant: |
Fountain Place, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2009cv00069 |
Filed: |
January 26, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Torts to Land Office |
County: |
Kanawha |
Presiding Judge: |
John T. Copenhaver, Jr. |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 15, 2012 |
Filing
203
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying defendant Fountain Place, LLC's 188 , 190 MOTIONS for judgment as a matter of law, except insofar as the Count Four negligence and Count Five trespass claims are dismissed as time barred; and directing that this action is stricken from the docket. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/15/2012. (cc: attys) (taq)
|
November 9, 2011 |
Filing
176
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that plaintiffs be precluded from relying upon the continuing tort exception. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/9/2011. (cc: attys) (tmh) (Modified "exemption" to "exception" to conform to filed document on 11/9/2011) (skh).
|
April 8, 2011 |
Filing
113
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Regarding the court's 104 Memorandum Opinion and Order entered on 3/3/2011; as more fully set forth herein, the court does not revisit the factual or legal discussion found in the 104 Order except as necessary to discuss the parties' attempts to clarify the record with supplemental briefing filed on 4/4/2011 and 4/7/2011. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 4/8/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ras)
|
March 3, 2011 |
Filing
104
ORDER denying plaintiff's 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Count Three; and denying defendant's 94 MOTION for Summary Judgment; this case will proceed according to the revised scheduling order entered this same day. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/3/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmh)
|
March 5, 2010 |
Filing
67
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER correcting and amending the name EQT Gathering Equity, LLC; directing that Count One of plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed as moot; dismissing defendant Fountain Place's 12 counterclaim; denying as moot Founta in Place's 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Count One of plaintiffs' complaint; denying Fountain Place's 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Count Two of plaintiffs' complaint; granting that portion of plaintiffs& #039; 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment seeking declaratory relief as to Count Two of plaintiffs' complaint, and denying as moot in all other respects; denying as moot plaintiffs' 10 MOTION and 27 RENEWED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/5/2010. (cc: attys) (taq) (Modified on 3/8/2010 to remove duplicate text) (skh).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?