Chandler et al v. Fischler
Plaintiff: |
Catherine C. Chandler, Thomas C. Naerebout, Cheryl K. Narum and Donna Hamra |
Defendant: |
Journey Education Marketing, Inc., CCV Software, Inc. and Michael S. Fischler |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv00839 |
Filed: |
June 17, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Charleston Office |
County: |
Kanawha |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 15, 2013 |
Filing
82
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER finding that the defendant has standing to compel arbitration, and that all of the plaintiffs' claims against defendant are arbitrable, defendant's 74 MOTION to Enforce Arbitration and to Transfer is grante d, and the parties are to arbitrate the claims; directing that this case be dismissed and stricken from the docket of this court; denying as moot defendant's 69 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Attached to 1 Notice of Removal or to Transfer. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/15/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (rea)
|
September 21, 2012 |
Filing
62
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying defendant Michael Fischler's 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; finding that the arbitration award does not preclude the claims against Fischler under either res judicata or collater al estoppel, and that the automatic stay provision in the United States Bankruptcy Code, 11 U.S.C. § 362(a)(1), does not apply to the plaintiffs' claims against Fischler, and the case will thus proceed; denying plaintiffs' 44 MOTION for Leave to File Amended complaint. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/21/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
|
May 15, 2012 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting plaintiffs' 16 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award; directing the disbursement of the escrow account at Capital One; granting defendants' 27 MOTION for Leave to File to File a Sur-Reply; and denying plaintiffs' request that the court award them costs and expenses against the defendants for having to confirm the award. The court will consider whether it has personal jurisdiction over Michael S. Fischler upon a renewed motion. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/15/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
|
December 3, 2010 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part defendants' 5 MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay. This matter is STAYED and the requirements of the court's 14 Order and Notice are CONTINUED; and directing this case placed on the inactive docket. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/3/2010. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?