Hagy et al v. Equitable Production Co. et al

Plaintiff: Dennis Hagy, Tamera Hagy, Dustin Hagy and Clark Hagy
Defendant: Equitable Production Co., Warren Drilling Company, Inc., BJ Services Company, USA and Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01372
Filed: December 10, 2010
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Jackson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2012 344 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting defendant BJ Services Company, USA's 193 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/29/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
May 17, 2012 328 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that EQT's 188 MOTION for Summary Judgment is granted; further directing that plaintiffs' counsel shall appear on 5/22/2012 at 2:00 p.m., and show cause as to why counsel's conduct, as more fully set forth herein, is not a violation of Rulle 11(b). Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/17/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
March 5, 2012 163 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying defendants' 88 MOTION to Strike; and denying defendants' 93 MOTION for Entry of a Lone Pine Order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/5/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cbo)
July 22, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant BJ Services Company, USA's 50 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part defendant Halliburton Energy Services Company's 54 MOTION for Joinder in BJ Services Company's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleading. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/22/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
April 28, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s 11 MOTION for Partial Dismissal of the Plaintiff's Complaint, and as directed and set forth more fully herein; denying plaintiffs' 19 MOTION for Leave to File a Response; and denying as moot Halliburton's 18 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' 17 Response. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/28/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagy et al v. Equitable Production Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Hagy
Represented By: Kevin C. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamera Hagy
Represented By: Kevin C. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Hagy
Represented By: Kevin C. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark Hagy
Represented By: Kevin C. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equitable Production Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Drilling Company, Inc.
Represented By: Colleen E. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ Services Company, USA
Represented By: Timothy D. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Debra Tedeschi Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?