Judd v. Secretary of State of West Virginia et al
Petitioner: |
Keith Russell Judd |
Respondent: |
Secretary of State of West Virginia and State of West Virginia |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv00369 |
Filed: |
May 23, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Charleston Office |
County: |
Kanawha |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas E. Johnston |
Presiding Judge: |
Mary E. Stanley |
Nature of Suit: |
Voting |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 30, 2013 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying plaintiff Keith Russell Judd's 25 MOTION for Relief from Judgment or Order under Twenty Fourth Amendment; and Motion to Amend for Court Order to Register All Convicted and Incarcerated Felons to Vote in all Federal Elections and Caucuses and Democratic National Convention; and for Order to Remove Barack Obama From State's 2012 Presidential Primary Election Ballot/Caucus and Award all Delegates to Keith Judd, Democratic Presidential Candidate. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 1/30/2013. (cc: pro se petitioner; attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
|
September 6, 2011 |
Filing
11
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting and incorporating the 8 Proposed Findings and Recommendation; plaintiff's objections to the Proposed Findings and Recommendation are overruled; plaintiff's 2 complaint is dismissed; and plaintiff& #039;s 10 MOTION to Reopen and Stay Proceedings Pending Decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation is denied. This case is dismissed and stricken from the court's docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/6/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?