February 8, 2017 |
Filing
127
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment) The 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/8/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
|
February 6, 2017 |
Filing
126
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D.) The 91 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case Specific Opinions of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig is DENIED in part and RESERVED in part. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/6/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp)
|
February 3, 2017 |
Filing
124
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) granting 85 MOTION by Joel Forester, Karen Forester for Partial Summary Judgment, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/3/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp)
|
January 24, 2017 |
Filing
123
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Motions in Limine) The plaintiffs' 107 MOTION by Joel Forester, Karen Forester in Limine is GRANTED in part as to Motion in Limine No. 1 and any other conceded motion therein, the remainder of the Motion i s DENIED without prejudice; Defendants' 105 OMNIBUS MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in Limine is GRANTED in part as to Motion in Limine No. 2 and any other conceded motion therein, the remainder of the Motion is DENIED witho ut prejudice; Defendants' 103 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiffs' Allegations of Spoliation is GRANTED; and Defendants' 112 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Le ave to File a Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Allegations of Spoliation is DENIED as moot, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/24/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
|
September 2, 2016 |
Filing
122
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Shelby Thames, Ph.D.) The court DENIES in part, GRANTS in part, and RESERVES in part the Motion filed in MDL 2327 by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 1 Cases to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Shelby Thames, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/2/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit) (bdr)
|
August 31, 2016 |
Filing
121
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Howard Jordi, Ph.D.) The court DENIES in part, GRANTS in part, and RESERVES in part the Motion filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Howard Jordi, Ph.D. in Wave 1 Cases, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/31/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit) (mmw)
|
August 26, 2016 |
Filing
118
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D.) The court DENIES in part, GRANTS in part, and RESERVES in part the Motion filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain General Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. in Wave 1 Cases, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/26/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit) (kll)
|
August 25, 2016 |
Filing
116
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Peggy Pence, Ph.D.) The court DENIES in part, GRANTS in part, and RESERVES in part the Motion filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Peggy Pence, Ph.D. in Wave 1 Cases, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/25/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit) (ts)
|
February 23, 2012 |
Filing
3
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring this case to the USDC Southern District of West Virginia to be included in MDL 2327 in re: ETHICON, INC., PELVIC REPAIR SYSTEM PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel. (hph) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 2/23/2012.]
|