Stevens v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Casey Stevens
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv00740
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John T. Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the 138 JOINT MOTION for consolidation of Cases 2:12-cv-0739 and 2:12-cv-0740; the two cases are consolidated for all purposes up to and including trial, with the Cisco matter designated as the lead action and all further filings in both cases to be made therein; the scheduling order in the Stevens matter is vacated, with the remaining deadlines for case events, conferences, and trial to proceed according to the schedule in Cisco; denying defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company's 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 4/17/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company's 98 MOTION to disqualify plaintiff's counsel due to an impermissible conflict of interest; granting the 105 MOTION to Withdraw as counsel. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/2/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company's 7 MOTION to dismiss the original complaint and for a more definite statement; denying as moot the plaintiff's 20 MOTION to amend the amended complaint; granting the plaintiff's 25 CORRECTED MOTION for leave to amend his amended complaint; directing that the second amended complaint, as corrected in the manner specified in footnote 2 herein, is filed effective th e date of its receipt, which shall be no later than 7/20/2012; denying, without prejudice as being moot, defendant's 13 MOTION to dismiss the amended complaint. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/11/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Stevens
Represented By: Joseph M. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: James M. Duckworth
Represented By: Robert S. Goggin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: J. Jarrod Jordan
Represented By: Angela W. Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?