February 3, 2017 |
Filing
119
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D.) The 86 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Specific-Causation Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. is GRANTED in part, DENIED in part, and RESERVED in part, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/3/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
|
January 24, 2017 |
Filing
115
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Motions in Limine) Plaintiff's 95 MOTION by Susan Guinn in Limine is GRANTED in part as to Motion in Limine No. 1 and any other conceded motion therein, the remainder of the Motion is DENIED without prejudice ; Defendants' 98 OMNIBUS MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in Limine is GRANTED in part as to Motion in Limine No. 2 and any other conceded motion therein, the remainder of the Motion is DENIED without prejudice; Defendants 9; 96 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Allegations of Spoliation is GRANTED, and Defendants 104 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Leave to File a Reply in Support of De fendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Allegations of Spoliation is DENIED as moot, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/24/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
|
September 2, 2016 |
Filing
114
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Shelby Thames, Ph.D.) The court DENIES in part, GRANTS in part, and RESERVES in part the Motion filed in MDL 2327 by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 1 Cases to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Shelby Thames, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/2/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit) (kll)
|
August 31, 2016 |
Filing
113
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Howard Jordi, Ph.D.) The court DENIES in part, GRANTS in part, and RESERVES in part the Motion filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Howard Jordi, Ph.D. in Wave 1 Cases, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/31/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit) (mmw)
|
August 30, 2016 |
Filing
110
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Stanley Zaslau, M.D.) The court DENIES in part, GRANTS in part, and RESERVES in part the Motion filed in MDL 2327 by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 1 Cases to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Stanley Zaslau, M.D., as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/30/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit) (mek)
|
August 26, 2016 |
Filing
109
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D.) The court DENIES in part, GRANTS in part, and RESERVES in part the Motion filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain General Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. in Wave 1 Cases, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/26/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit) (kll)
|
August 25, 2016 |
Filing
107
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Peggy Pence, Ph.D.) The court DENIES in part, GRANTS in part, and RESERVES in part the Motion filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Peggy Pence, Ph.D. in Wave 1 Cases, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/25/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit) (ts)
|