Chilton et al v. Chilton et al
Plaintiff: |
William Ruffner Chilton and Cynthia Chilton Wilson |
Defendant: |
Robert Maxwell Chilton, Alice Chilton Zuber, United Bank, Inc., United Bankshares, Inc., Twelve Sixty-Six Corporation and Kanawha Village Apartments, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv02090 |
Filed: |
June 15, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Charleston Office |
County: |
Kanawha |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas E. Johnston |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 28, 2013 |
Filing
113
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Dismissing this case without prejudice and directing Clerk to remove this case from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/27/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
|
March 29, 2013 |
Filing
63
ORDER denying as moot plaintiffs' 2 MOTION for a temporary restraining order; denying as moot plaintiffs' 4 MOTION for expedited discovery; denying Chilton defendants' 12 MOTION to dismiss; denying the corporate defendants' 19 MOTION to dismiss Count VIII; denying as moot plaintiffs' 25 MOTION for a preliminary injunction; denying United Bank's 29 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim; denying corporate defendants' 31 MOTION to dismiss fo r failure to join required parties; denying as moot United Bank's 36 MOTION to exclude testimony or evidence; denying Chilton defendants' 41 MOTION to dismiss; denying plaintiffs' 46 MOTION to file surreply; denying plaintiffs� 39; 48 MOTION to revise scheduling order; granting as unopposed plaintiffs' 49 MOTION to enter preliminary injunction order; further directing the parties to fully brief all issues concerning joinder of any necessary but absent persons and e ntities, file appropriate motions, and, if required, tender evidence in support of any additional motions; and further striking the phrase "an individual" from the designation of both Chilton defendants in the case caption. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 3/29/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jap)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?