Cooper v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Rhonda Cooper |
Defendant: |
Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and John Doe Corporations and Individuals 1-50 |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv02532 |
Filed: |
July 3, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Charleston Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph R. Goodwin |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 14, 2017 |
Filing
72
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: William Porter, M.D.) The 62 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case-Specific Opinions of Dr. William Porter is GRANTED in part, DENIED in part, and RESERVED in part, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/14/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
|
June 16, 2017 |
Filing
69
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment) The 53 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment Based on the Statute of Limitations is DENIED; and 60 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Ethicon's Motion is GRANTED with regard to the following claims: (II) strict liability - manufacturing defect, (IV) strict liability - defective product, (VI) commo n law fraud, (VII) fraudulent concealment, (VIII) constructive fraud, (IX) negligent misrepresentation, (X) negligent infliction of emotional distress, (XI) breach of express warranty, (XII) breach of implied warranty, (XIII) violation of consumer protection laws, and (XV) unjust enrichment. Ethicons Motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/16/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?