Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Inc. et al v. Alex Energy, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Inc., West Virginia Highlands Conservancy, Inc. and Sierra Club
Defendant: Alex Energy, Inc., Aracoma Coal Co., Inc., Bandmill Coal Corp., Highland Mining Co., Independence Coal Co., Inc., Jacks Branch Coal Co. and Kanawha Energy Co.
Case Number: 2:2012cv03412
Filed: July 16, 2012
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 87 MOTION for partial summary judgment, consistent with the findings herein; granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' 85 MOTION for partial summ ary judgment and for declaratory and injunctive relief and civil penalties against Bandmill; granting in part and denying in part Bandmill's 89 MOTION for partial summary judgment; granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' 91 MOTION for partial summary judgment and for declaratory and injunctive relief and civil penalties against Aracoma, Highland, Independence, and Kanawha Energy; denying Highland's 93 MOTION for partial summary judgment; denying as moot p laintiffs' 119 Rule 37(c) MOTION to strike Exhibit 1 of Highland's reply brief in support of its motion for partial summary judgment; granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' 83 MOTION for partial summary judgment and for declaratory and injunctive relief and civil penalties against Jacks Branch; granting Jacks Branch's 95 MOTION for partial summary judgment as to Outfall 015 of Jacks Branch's WV/NPDES Permit WV1012452; and holding in abeyan ce Jacks Branch's 133 MOTION for a partial stay pending entry of a consent decree; directing the parties to file a report regarding the status of the remaining claims, plans for disposition of those claims, and plans for phase II of this litigation within 21 days of the entry of this Memorandum Opinion and Order, and as directed and set forth more fully herein. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/31/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
February 2, 2015 179 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 176 Notice of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree; directing that the Consent Decree be entered with the Court's approval on this date; with the entry of this decree, the Court ORDERS that this action be dism issed and stricken from the active docket, with the Court retaining jurisdiction over this case as set forth in Paragraphs 100-102 of the Consent Decree. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/2/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
June 13, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 23 MOTION to Compel; denying Defendant's 29 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; granting Plaintiff's 39 MOTION for Relief under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d). Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/13/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Inc. et al v. Alex Energy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lovett
Represented By: Derek O. Teaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia Highlands Conservancy, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lovett
Represented By: Derek O. Teaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lovett
Represented By: Derek O. Teaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aracoma Coal Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bandmill Coal Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Mining Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independence Coal Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacks Branch Coal Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kanawha Energy Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.