Sanchez et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: |
Roseanne Sanchez and Rod Sanchez |
Defendant: |
Boston Scientific Corporation |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv05762 |
Filed: |
September 21, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Charleston Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph R. Goodwin |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Inj. Prod. Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 12, 2015 |
Filing
153
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Motions in Limine) the 135 OMNIBUS MOTIONS by Rod Sanchez, Roseanne Sanchez in Limine is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part and the 137 OMNIBUS MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation in Limine is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/12/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (skh)
|
October 17, 2014 |
Filing
151
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration) denying 149 MOTION by Rod Sanchez, Roseanne Sanchez for Reconsideration of 148 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/17/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh)
|
September 29, 2014 |
Filing
148
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motions) for the reasons stated herein, the 92 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Exclude Plaintiff's Experts' Opinion that Polypropylene Mid-Urethral Slings Are Defective is DENIED; the 71 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Thomas H. Barker, Ph.D. and the 115 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Mark Slack are GRANTED; the 58 MOTION by Boston Scientifi c Corporation to Exclude the Testimony of Michael Thomas Margolis, M.D. is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART and RESERVED IN PART; the 86 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Richard W. Trepeta, M.D., th e 98 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jimmy W. Mays, Ph.D. and Samuel P. Gido, Ph.D. and the 117 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Peggy Pence are GRANTED IN PA RT and DENIED IN PART; and the 113 MOTION by Rod Sanchez, Roseanne Sanchez to Exclude or Limit the Testimony of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation's Expert Christine Brauer, Ph.D. is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/29/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh)
|
August 18, 2014 |
Filing
134
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Motions for Summary Judgment on Substantive Claims and Punitive Damages) granting in part and denying in part 60 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs Rosanne Sanchez and Rod S anchez; granting in part and denying in part 62 MOTION by Rod Sanchez, Roseanne Sanchez for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 64 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Punitive Damages Claim. Directing the Clerk to post a copy of this published opinion on the court's website, www.wvsd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/18/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh)
|
January 17, 2014 |
Filing
55
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Boston Scientific Corporation's 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Statute of Limitations. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/17/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?