Simpson v. City of Charleston et al
Plaintiff: |
Cory A. Simpson |
Defendant: |
City of Charleston and B. A. Lightner |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv08766 |
Filed: |
May 6, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Charleston Office |
County: |
Kanawha |
Presiding Judge: |
Cheryl A. Eifert |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph R. Goodwin |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 9, 2014 |
Filing
80
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER SEALING EXHIBIT granting defendant's 77 motion to Seal Exhibit 2; due to the confidential nature of the information, directing Exhibit 2 to be sealed; the Court finds that sealing Exhibit 2 does not unduly or significantly prejudice the public's right to access court documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/9/2014. (cc: plaintiff, pro se; all counsel of record) (taq)
|
December 12, 2013 |
Filing
32
ORDER accepting and incorporating the 24 Proposed Findings and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; denying the 13 Motion to Dismiss as it pertains to Officer Lightner; granting said motion to dismiss, without prejudice, as it pertains to the City of Charleston; directing the City of Charleston removed from the style of this case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/12/2013. (cc: plaintiff; attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
|
November 20, 2013 |
Filing
23
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER and NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE denying Plaintiff's 18 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, and 20 MOTION to Supress all Evidence Favorable to the Plaintiff; directing that the following dates are fixed as dates and times by or on which certain events must occur: Last day to conduct Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/3/2013; Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/9/2013; Initial Conference set for 12/13/2013 at 11:00 AM in Huntington before Magistrat e Judge Cheryl A. Eifert; the parties are advised that the provisions of Fed. R. Civ. P 14 and 15 with respect to the time in which to file third-party claims and to amend pleadings without leave of the court are not affected by this Order and Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/20/2013. (cc: Plaintiff; attys; any unrepresented party) (tmh)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?